Finch v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Finch and John P. Finch, Sr.
Defendant: Moore, Joseph Calleja and Donald Moore
Case Number: 8:2016cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Plattsburgh Office
County: Clinton
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2017 Partial Filing fee: $ 46.97, receipt number SYR050300 (nas, )
April 6, 2017 Filing 24 JUDGMENT in favor of Donald Moore, Joseph Calleja against John P. Finch, Sr. (Copy served via regular) (Attachments: #1 Appeal Notice) (ban) Modified on 4/6/2017 (ban).
April 6, 2017 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 17) is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's complaint (Dkt. No. 1) is DISMISSED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants' favor and close this case; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/6/17. (Copy served via regular )(ban) Modified on 4/6/2017 (ban).
December 29, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE/Letter dated March 15, 2016 sent to Clinton Correctional Facility and return on December 29, 2016 from Elmira Correctional Facility enclosing copy of Inmate Financial Statement. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(khr)
October 27, 2016 Filing 21 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. (Unable to Forward) re: 19 Order, sent to John P. Finch, Sr Address sent to Clinton County Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2000, Dannemora, NY 12929 (jzm,)
October 18, 2016 Filing 20 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. re: Notice of Hearing on Motion, sent to John P. Finch, Sr Address sent to Clinton County Correctional Facility P.O. Box 2000, Dannemora, NY 12929 (jzm,)
October 14, 2016 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER re #18 Status Report filed by Donald Moore, Joseph Calleja: The Court hereby ORDERS that the Court will decide defendants motion within thirty days if the plaintiff fails to provide the court with his current address. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 10/14/2016. [copy mailed to plaintiff via regular mail](ban)
October 11, 2016 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT informing the Court that defendants' motion to dismiss papers served upon plaintiff at the address he has provided were returned to sender by Joseph Calleja, Donald Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Starlin, Keith)
October 6, 2016 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution : The Motion Hearing is RESET for 11/15/2016 (ON SUBMIT) before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino; Response to Motion due by 10/31/2016, Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/7/2016. (ban)
October 6, 2016 Copy of Text Notice mailed to pro se plaintiff at address listed on the docket. (ban)
October 5, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Motion Hearing set for 12/1/2016 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart Response to Motion due by 11/14/2016 Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/21/2016. filed by Joseph Calleja, Donald Moore. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Memorandum of Law, #7 Declaration of service) (Starlin, Keith)
May 20, 2016 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable [unable to forward] re: 14 Text Order; and #15 Pretrial Scheduling Order mailed to John P. Finch, Sr. at Clinton Correctional Facility, Dannemora, NY. (lah)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 7/8/2016. Discovery due by 2/10/2017. Motions to Compel due by 3/13/2017. Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/9/2016. {Copy of this Order mailed to pro se plaintiff}. (mab)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for June 14, 2016 at 9:00 AM before the undersigned and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date. In order to expedite the disposition of this action, the Court will issue a Pretrial Scheduling Order. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/9/2016. {Copy of this Text Order mailed to pro se plaintiff}. (mab)
April 22, 2016 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Joseph Calleja, Donald Moore. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Starlin, Keith)
April 13, 2016 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to deft Joseph Calleja. (lah)
April 12, 2016 Filing 11 BILL OF COSTS submitted by U.S. Marshal re: Service Fees totaling $16.00. (lah)
April 11, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith J. Starlin on behalf of Joseph Calleja, Donald Moore (Starlin, Keith)
April 11, 2016 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Donald Moore served on 4/1/2016, answer due 4/22/2016. Acknowledgment filed by Donald Moore. (Starlin, Keith)
April 11, 2016 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY MAIL Executed as to Joseph Calleja served on 4/2/2016, answer due 4/25/2016. (lah)
March 21, 2016 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (Unknown/Not Here/Released) sent to John P. Finch, Sr. and addressed to Clinton Correctional Facility. (lah)
March 15, 2016 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Joseph Calleja, Donald Moore. (Attachment: Summons as to (1) Trooper Calleja)(lah)
March 15, 2016 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/14/2016 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/7/2016. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (lah)[copy served on pltf by regular mail]
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Plaintiff's IFP Motion, Dkt. No. #2 , is GRANTED; and that the Clerk shall issue summonses and forward them, along with the Complaint, a copy of this Order, and GO25, to the USMS for service upon defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/15/2016. (lah)[copy of Order served on pltf by regular mail]
January 4, 2016 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by John P. Finch, Sr. (nas, )
January 4, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John P. Finch, Sr. (Attachments: #1 one page of motion) (nas, )
January 4, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John P. Finch, Sr filed by John P. Finch, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finch v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Calleja
Represented By: Keith J. Starlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Moore
Represented By: Keith J. Starlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Finch, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?