Sanderson v. First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Edmund G. Sanderson
Defendant: First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 8:2016cv00644
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Plattsburgh Office
County: Clinton
Presiding Judge: Christian F. Hummel
Presiding Judge: David N. Hurd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM-DECISION & ORDER that First Liberty's 123 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED; and Sanderson's 136 and 137 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 5/7/2019. (Copy served upon Edmund G. Sanderson via regular mail on 5/7/2019)(see)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting First Liberty's 32 Partial Motion to Dismiss. Count One, Count Four, Count Five, Count Six, Count Seven, Count Eight, Count Nine, and Count Ten are dismissed. Sanderson's claims for special damages are dismissed. Sanderson's breach of contract claim (pleaded as Count Two and Count Three) remains for discovery. First Liberty is directed to file an answer to Sanderson's amended complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the pending motions. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 11/7/17. (Copy served via regular mail)(sfp, )
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM-DECISION & ORDER that Liberty's 5 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED; Sanderson's motion for an extension of time to perfect service is GRANTED; and Sanderson's complaint (ECF No. 15) is deemed the operative pleading in this action; First Liberty must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 4/19/2017. (Copy served upon Edmund G. Sanderson via regular mail on 4/19/2017)(see)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanderson v. First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund G. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Liberty Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Sharon Angelino
Represented By: Jonathan Schapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?