United States of America v. One 24-Foot Hydro Yacht et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: One 24-Foot Hydro Yacht and One aluminum beam boat trailer
Case Number: 8:2019cv00265
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 19:1595a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED WARRANT for Arrest of Articles in Rem issued by United States of America. (khr) Modified on 3/21/2019 (jel, ).
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Letter Motion from Adam Katz for United States of America requesting The proposed Amended Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem be executed . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Warrant for Arrest of Articles in Rem)(Katz, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 WARRANT for Arrest of Articles in Rem issued filed by United States of America. (khr)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM: Against One 24-Foot Hydro Yacht, One aluminum beam boat trailer filed by United States of America (Fee waived, U.S. Gov't). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. One 24-Foot Hydro Yacht et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 24-Foot Hydro Yacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One aluminum beam boat trailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Adam J. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?