McAllister v. Catalyst Aviation, LLC
Plaintiff: Benjamin McAllister
Defendant: Catalyst Aviation, LLC
Not Yet Classified: David R. Homer
Case Number: 8:2019cv00642
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that David R. Homer has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Fred G. Wexler and Edward A. Betz. Dated: July 26, 2019(Wexler, Fred)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER of Consolidation of Discovery. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys that the McAllister action (8:19-cv-642) and the Roundpoint/Kearns action (8:19-cv-647) are hereby consolidated for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/2/2019. (mab)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MANDATORY MEDIATION PROGRAM: This case is referred to participation in the Mandatory Mediation Program. The parties should refer to General Order #47. The deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 12/13/2019. The deadline for the parties file a Stipulation selecting a Mediator is 7/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/2/2019. (mab)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 12 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 3/2/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2020. The Court has discussed Mandatory Mediation with the parties and will issue a separate Order referring this action into the Mandatory Mediation Program. The deadline to complete Mandatory Mediation is 12/13/2019. Discovery due by 8/31/2020. Motions to be filed by 9/30/2020. Status Report due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/2/2019. (mab)
July 1, 2019 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/1/2019. Appearances: Edward Betz, Esq. for Plaintiff; Fred Wexler, Esq. for Defendant; Thomas Mortati, Esq. for Plaintiff in Case No. 19-cv-647. This action arises from the same incident in Case No. 19-cv-647. Both cases are being reviewed by the District Judge to determine if they should be deemed related. Counsel believe they are related and both should be on the same discovery track. Counsel sign a Stipulation to Consolidate Cases for purpose of discovery and submit it to the Court for approval. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions and how they intend to proceed in this matter. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. (TIME: 9:00AM-9:19AM). (mab)
June 28, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is set for 7/1/2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Counsel are to appear IN PERSON at the James T. Foley US Courthouse, 445 Broadway, 4th Floor, Room 409, Albany, NY on the scheduled date and time. (mab)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Catalyst Aviation, LLC. (Wexler, Fred)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 Letter Motion from Fred G. Wexler for Catalyst Aviation, LLC requesting Designation of Case as Complex submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Wexler, Fred)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Benjamin McAllister. (Betz, Edward)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Related Case by Catalyst Aviation, LLC submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . Objections due by 6/18/2019 (Wexler, Fred)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Catalyst Aviation, LLC. (Wexler, Fred)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Betz on behalf of Benjamin McAllister (Betz, Edward)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Defendant; Attorney Robert J. Brown, Phone number is 212-983-8500. [Notice of Admission Requirement was mailed to Attorney Brown via regular mail on 5/31/2019.] Admissions due by 6/14/2019. (hmr)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/24/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT ANSWER relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Catalyst Aviation, LLC. (hmr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Catalyst Aviation, LLC. (hmr)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Lawrence County Supreme Court, case number EFCV - 19-155126 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4756791) filed by Catalyst Aviation, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Notice to Admit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAllister v. Catalyst Aviation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin McAllister
Represented By: Edward A. Betz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catalyst Aviation, LLC
Represented By: Fred G. Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: David R. Homer
Represented By: David R. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?