Malott v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Anna Malott
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 8:2019cv01129
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Maggio on behalf of Anna Malott (Maggio, Edward)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Rogers, James)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' joint #16 Letter Request seeking a stay of discovery and all pretrial deadlines in this matter while the parties pursue settlement discussions. Counsel are to file a Status Report by November 15, 2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/27/2019. (mab)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 Joint Letter Motion from Vivian M. Quinn for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated requesting Stay of Discovery and Pre-trial deadlines submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney James F. Rogers is hereby admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Defendants. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/23/2019. (mab)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4877818. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #9 Notice of Appearance (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #10 Notice of Appearance (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Quinn, Vivian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., dated 9/17/2019 advising he will not be representing Defendants in this action. (re #7 Notice of Admission Requirement) (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Jeff Seldomridge, Esq., Email address is jseldomridge@millerfirmllc.com. Phone number is 540-672-4224. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01563. electronically transferred when case opened
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-1563-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15533118 filed by Anna Malott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malott v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Malott
Represented By: Edward Maggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?