Ashe v. Sapona Plastics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kelly Ashe
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Sapona Plastics, LLC and Trim Brush Company, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01234
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER approving #21 Stipulation filed by Walmart Inc. seeking consent Order granting substitution of attorney by Walmart Inc., Attorney Michael P. Cavanagh terminated.Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/25/2019. (tab)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER approving #20 Stipulation filed by Trim Brush Company seeking consent Order granting substitution of attorney by Trim Brush Company, Inc., Attorney Sean A. Tomko terminated.Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/25/2019. (tab)
November 25, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trim Brush Company, Inc., Walmart Inc. (Guetti, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 Trim Brush ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by co-defendant Sapona Plastics by Trim Brush Company, Inc..(Guetti, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trim Brush Company, Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Guetti, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 Trim Brush & Walmart ANSWER to #1 Complaint with, CROSSCLAIM against Sapona Plastics, LLC by Trim Brush Company, Inc., Walmart Inc..(Guetti, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION seeking consent Order granting substitution of attorney by Walmart Inc. submitted to Judge Hummel. (Guetti, Christopher)
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION seeking consent Order granting substitution of attorney by Trim Brush Company, Inc. submitted to Judge Hummell. (Guetti, Christopher)
November 21, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefanie D. Bradshaw on behalf of Kelly Ashe (Bradshaw, Stefanie)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #16 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of defendant Sapona Plastics, LLC by Walmart Inc..(Cavanagh, Michael)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Sapona Plastics, LLC Rule 7.1 Statement (Warren, Edward)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Trim Brush Company, Inc., Walmart Inc. by Sapona Plastics, LLC.(Warren, Edward)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting/approving #14 Letter Request and Stipulation to extend answer deadline for Defendant Trim Brush Company, Inc. Answer due 11/26/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/31/2019. (tab)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Trim Brush for Trim Brush Company, Inc. requesting Extension to Answer submitted to Judge Hummel . (Attachments: #1 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer)(Tomko, Sean)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Letter Request from Edward Warren for Sapona Plastics, LLC requesting Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Answer: Sapona Plastics, LLC answer now due on 11/8/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/29/2019. (tab)
October 29, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Trim Brush Company, Inc. answer due 10/30/2019. (see)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Edward Warren for Sapona Plastics, LLC requesting Stipulation and Order to Extend Time to Answer submitted to Judge Hummel . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Warren, Edward)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Pat Flake of Walmart, Inc. on 10/11/19, filed by Kelly Ashe. (Rudderow, Michelle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Connie Christy of Trim Brush Company, Inc. on 10/09/19, filed by Kelly Ashe. (Rudderow, Michelle)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Dean Lail of Sapona Plastics, LLC on 10/09/19, filed by Kelly Ashe. (Rudderow, Michelle)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Letter Request from Michael P. Cavanagh, ESq. for Walmart Inc. requesting extension of time to answer. Walmart Inc. answer due 11/29/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/23/2019. (tab)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Stefanie D. Bradshaw, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/23/2019. (tab)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Michael P. Cavanagh, ESq. for Walmart Inc. requesting extension of time to answer submitted to Judge Hummel . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Cavanagh, Michael)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Kelly Ashe. Amendment to #4 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stefanie D. Bradshaw Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4916345. Proposed Order/Judgment to be filed in place of prior attachment (#4). (Rudderow, Michelle)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Stefanie D. Bradshaw Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4916345. filed by Kelly Ashe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Petition, #2 Declaration Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Exhibit(s) New Attorney E-filing Registration, #4 Proposed Order/Judgment, #5 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing, #6 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Rudderow, Michelle)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/2/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/26/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Sapona Plastics, LLC, Trim Brush Company, Inc., and Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Trim Brush Company, Inc., #2 Summons for Sapona Plastics, LLC)(see)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Sapona Plastics, LLC, Trim Brush Company, Inc., and Walmart Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4895789) filed by Kelly Ashe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashe v. Sapona Plastics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Guetti
Represented By: Michael P. Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sapona Plastics, LLC
Represented By: Edward G. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trim Brush Company, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Guetti
Represented By: Sean A. Tomko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Ashe
Represented By: Michelle Ellsworth Rudderow
Represented By: Stefanie D. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?