Telfer v. Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SHOWAYNE TELFER
Defendant: BILL RAVENUE, RUSSEL STONE, TONY BALDWIN and MOLD-RITE PLASTICS, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01290
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Reissued out of NYND as to TONY BALDWIN. (plp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 19 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/21/2020, 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/14/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (plp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Ishan Dave, Esq., Email address is mr.ishan.dave@gmail.com. Phone number is 516-297-6665. Admissions due by 11/4/2019. (plp)
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04286. electronically transferred when case opened
October 16, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK. NOW, THEREFORE, in consideration of the foregoing, Plaintiff and Defendants agree and hereby stipulate to: Transfer this action to the Unites States District Court for the Northern District of New York and request that this action be transferred accordingly; All pretrial deadlines, including Defendants' time to plead, answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, shall be stayed pending this Court's resolution of whether this action should be transferred to the Northern District; In the event that this Court denies transfer of this matter pursuant to this Stipulation, Defendants shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order denying transfer to plead, answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint; and, In the event that this Court orders the transfer of this matter to the Northern District of New York, Defendants shall plead, answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint within twenty (20) days from the date that the Complaint is filed in the Northern District of New York. In light of the parties foregoing stipulations, and the Court's conclusion that the interests of justice support transfer of the action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, it is ORDERED that this action shall be transferred from the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). So ordered. Motions terminated: #15 JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case STIPULATED BY THE PARTIES filed by Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC, Russel Stone, Bill Ravenue. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/16/2019) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION to Transfer Case STIPULATED BY THE PARTIES. Document filed by Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC, Bill Ravenue, Russel Stone.(Polsinelli, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Service due by 12/6/2019. (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/7/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tony Baldwin. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 12 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Tony Baldwin addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ishan Dave, Esq. dated 10/7/2019. Document filed by Showayne Telfer.(Dave, Ishan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tony Baldwin, re: #3 Complaint. Document filed by Showayne Telfer. (Dave, Ishan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Russel Stone waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Document filed by Showayne Telfer. (Dave, Ishan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019; Bill Ravenue waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Document filed by Showayne Telfer. (Dave, Ishan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/15/2019. (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/4/2019) (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Vincent E. Polsinelli dated October 4, 2019. Document filed by Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC, Bill Ravenue, Russel Stone.(Polsinelli, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent E. Polsinelli on behalf of Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC, Bill Ravenue, Russel Stone. (Polsinelli, Vincent) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to serve all defendants addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ishan Dave, Esq. dated 8/8/2019. Document filed by Showayne Telfer. Application GRANTED. So ordered. (Service due by 10/7/2019). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/8/2019) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to serve all defendants addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Ishan Dave, Esq. dated 8/8/2019. Document filed by Showayne Telfer.(Dave, Ishan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Tony Baldwin, Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC, Bill Ravenue, Russel Stone. Document filed by Showayne Telfer.(Dave, Ishan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dave, Ishan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ishan Dave. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tony Baldwin, Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC, Bill Ravenue, Russel Stone, Showayne Telfer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ishan Dave to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Ishan Dave. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against SHOWAYNE TELFER. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16864693)Document filed by SHOWAYNE TELFER.(Dave, Ishan) Modified on 5/13/2019 (pne). [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telfer v. Mold-Rite Plastics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHOWAYNE TELFER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BILL RAVENUE
Represented By: Vincent E. Polsinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUSSEL STONE
Represented By: Vincent E. Polsinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONY BALDWIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOLD-RITE PLASTICS, LLC
Represented By: Vincent E. Polsinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?