Maroney v. Village of Norwood et al
Plaintiff: Kasey Maroney
Defendant: Norwood Village Police Department, Village of Norwood and Seth Donalis
Case Number: 8:2019cv01404
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Letter Request from Seth Donalis, requesting an extension of time to file an answer to the complaint, Seth Donalis answer due 1/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/9/2020. (Copy served via regular mail on 1/9/2020)(tab)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Letter Motion from Seth Donalis, requesting an extension of time to file an answer to the complaint so that defendant can find an attorney. Submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel. (see)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Seth Donalis on 12/20/2019, filed by Kasey Maroney. (McCarthy, Ryan)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order ***Answer due date updated for Seth Donalis answer due 1/10/2020. (see)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kasey Maroney. Norwood Village Police Department waiver sent on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (McCarthy, Ryan)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kasey Maroney. Village of Norwood waiver sent on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (McCarthy, Ryan)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 2/11/2020 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/4/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Seth Donalis, Norwood Village Police Department, and Village of Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Seth Donalis, #2 Summons for Norwood Village Police Department)(see)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Seth Donalis, Norwood Village Police Department, and Village of Norwood (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4941579) filed by Kasey Maroney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maroney v. Village of Norwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norwood Village Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Donalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasey Maroney
Represented By: Ryan L. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?