Clinton County v. Netherlands Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Clinton County
Defendant: Netherlands Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01421
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL: Order approving the #8 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 1/6/2020. (kmp)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Clinton County submitted to Judge Thomas J. McAvoy. (O'Malley, Brady)
December 26, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 1/17/2020 at 9:30AM before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel and the deadline to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion (tab)
December 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2020 10:00 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy Response to Motion due by 12/27/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/2/2020. filed by Netherlands Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 - Complaint with Attachments, #3 Exhibit(s) 2 - Insurance Policy, #4 Memorandum of Law) (Potashner, Marshall)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Letter Request, Netherlands Insurance Company answer due 12/20/2019 from Marshall T. Potashner for Netherlands Insurance Company requesting Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Hon. Christian F. Hummel Until December 20, 2019. The Initial Conference is reset for 1/17/2020 @ 9:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/10/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/21/2019. (tab)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 Consent Letter Motion from Marshall T. Potashner for Netherlands Insurance Company requesting Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Hon. Christian F. Hummel Until December 20, 2019. (Potashner, Marshall)
November 19, 2019 ***Answer due date set for Netherlands Insurance Company answer due 11/25/2019. (kmp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/13/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to the #1 Notice of Removal filed by Netherlands Insurance Company. (kmp)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clinton County Supreme Court, case number 2019-00001540. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4947361) filed by Netherlands Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clinton County v. Netherlands Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netherlands Insurance Company
Represented By: Marshall T. Potashner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton County
Represented By: Brady J. O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?