Sportsinsurance.com, Inc. v. The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sportsinsurance.com, Inc.
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2020cv00403
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc.. (Cost, David)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Sportsinsurance.com, Inc.. (Frimet, Michael)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 LETTER REQUEST & ORDER granting plaintiff's #7 Letter Request for an extension of the motion deadlines re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing is reset for 6/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2020. Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/26/2020. As a reminder, all of Judge Kahn's motions are considered on the submission of the papers, only. No personal appearances are required. No oral arguments will be entertained. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on April 27, 2020. (sas)
April 25, 2020 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Michael J. Frimet for Sportsinsurance.com, Inc. requesting extension of time to file Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, and other motion deadlines, submitted to Judge Lawrence E. Kahn . (Frimet, Michael)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Frimet on behalf of Sportsinsurance.com, Inc. (Frimet, Michael)
April 17, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for May 6, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart and the deadline for the parties to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED without date pending a decision on the dispositive motion. (mab)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn Response to Motion due by 4/28/2020 Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/4/2020. filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David M. Cost, Esq., #2 Exhibit(s) A-Commerical Crime Policy, #3 Exhibit(s) B-January 24, 2017 letter, #4 Exhibit(s) C-April 10, 2017 Letter, #5 Exhibit(s) D-May 8, 2017 letter, #6 Exhibit(s) E-October 25, 2019 letter, #7 Exhibit(s) F-December 12, 2019 letter, #8 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement, #9 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion) (Cost, David)
April 7, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc. answer due 4/13/2020. (sfp, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party plaintiff; Attorney Michael Frimet, Email address is mfrimet@vogrinfrimet.com. Phone number is (212) 513-1075. Admissions due by 4/20/2020. [Served by email.] (sfp, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/29/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT. (sfp, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Essex County Supreme Court, case number CV20-0118 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 5080707) filed by The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sportsinsurance.com, Inc. v. The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sportsinsurance.com, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Wilkins
Represented By: Michael James Frimet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Cost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?