LaFlesh et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scott LaFlesh and Tia LaFlesh
Defendant: Ethicon Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 8:2020cv00654
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 TEXT NOTICE to counsel of record for defts, re #52 Notice of Appearance, #53 Notice of Appearance, #50 Notice of Appearance, and #51 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. This case was just transferred in from the District of West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020. Several attorneys who were in the previous District's case are not admitted to the NDNY, therefore admission letters went out advising them that they need to be admitted in order to practice in this District. Please conventionally serve the documents electronically filed today and electronically file proof of service. (see)
June 11, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Katz Gerstel on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gerstel, Diana)
June 11, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
June 11, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of Counsel (Kabbash, Maha)
June 11, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kabbash, Maha)
June 11, 2020 Filing 49 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/6/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Served electronically upon counsel of record while awaiting admissions} (jmb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants' William M. Gage, Esq., Email: william.gage@butlersnow.com; Jordan N. Walker, Esq., Email: Jordan.Walker@butlersnow.com; Christy D. Jones, Esq., Email: christy.jones@butlersnow.com; Christopher D. Morris, Esq., Email: chris.morris@butlersnow.com; Kari L. Sutherland, Esq., Email: kari.sutherland@butlersnow.com; Anita Modak-Truran, Esq., Email: anita.modaktruran@butlersnow.com; Caroline Dye Walker, Esq., Email: caroline.walker@butlersnow.com; Susan M. Robinson, Esq., Email: srobinson@tcspllc.com; and David B. Thomas, Esq., Email: dthomas@tcspllc.com. Admissions due by 6/25/2020. {Counsel served electronically} (jmb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiffs'; Lee B. Balefsky, Esq., Email: Lee.Balefsky@Klinespecter.com; Michelle L. Tiger, Esq., Email: mtiger@youmancaputo.com; Priscilla E. Jimenez, Esq., Email: priscilla.jimenez@klinespecter.com; Kline & Specter office phone number 215-772-1000. Admissions due by 6/25/2020. {Counsel served electronically} (jmb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 46 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-00976. electronically transferred when case opened. {Clinton County, New York} (jmb)
June 1, 2020 Filing 45 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) Pls Mem in Support of Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) Defs Resp to Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Prior Response of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7329) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7455) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr.)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3671) Pls Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3675) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3784) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3863) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7327) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7437) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Harvey A. Winkler)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7461) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7467) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 42 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (6887) Pls Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6897) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (7027) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (7299) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7456) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Catherine Matthews)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 41 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7298) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7406) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 40 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part7 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #27 Exhibit MDL ECF (7342) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #28 Exhibit MDL ECF (7364) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 39 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (7335) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7362) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 38 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7334) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7356) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7446) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 37 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20-Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 36 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7343) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7449) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7466) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 35 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #34 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 7- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 1, 2020 Filing 34 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/3/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 06/05/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 06/04/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/22/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Scott LaFlesh, Tia LaFlesh in support of #31 Opposition. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 OPPOSITION by Scott LaFlesh, Tia LaFlesh to #30 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kevin Jovanovic (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
December 14, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Kevin Jovanovic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 29 OPPOSITION by Scott LaFlesh, Tia LaFlesh to #27 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #27 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 26 THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Gamal Eltabbakh on 1/14/2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Attachments: #1 Deposition Protocol, #2 Subpoena)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #24 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
November 28, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
November 8, 2018 Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Gamal Eltabbakh on 11/12/2018 at 1:00 p.m. (Attachment: #1 Appendix Subpoena)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family Members on dates and at times to be determined. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Issuing Subpoena to Dr. Gamal Eltabbakh by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Gamal Eltabbakh on 10/24/2018 at 3:00 p.m. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Morris, Christopher) (Modified on 9/17/2018 to remove party filer)(rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Scott LaFlesh, Tia LaFlesh for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Tia LaFlesh on 09/06/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline D. Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Caroline) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jordan N. Walker on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Jordan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Anita Modak-Truran on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 11 NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Continuing with the presently pending case without any waiver pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Scott LaFlesh, Tia LaFlesh. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (jsa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
January 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Gamal Eltabbakh on 3/21/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
October 3, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
June 8, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Scott LaFlesh, Tia LaFlesh. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
March 25, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
March 17, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
January 26, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 162 (Order re: List of Cases Related to Compliance with PTO # 17) entered on 01/22/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3650686. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 6/11/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFlesh et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott LaFlesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia LaFlesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?