BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Pat Remington Trucking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Defendant: Pat Remington Trucking, LLC and Patrick R. Remington
Case Number: 8:2020cv00983
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Patrick R. Remington answer due 10/2/2020. (map)
September 22, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A. re #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order, #4 FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Complaint,,, #2 Summons Issued (Little, Jason)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BMO Harris Bank N.A. re #1 Complaint,,, #2 Summons Issued upon Secretary of State (Little, Jason)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED:Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 11/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/16/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Pat Remington Trucking, LLC, and Patrick R. Remington. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Patrick R. Remington)(map)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMO Harris Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp., Corporate Parent Bank of Montreal, Toronto, Canada for BMO Harris Bank N.A. (map)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pat Remington Trucking, LLC, and Patrick R. Remington (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5216347)filed by BMO Harris Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loan and Security Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Loan and Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Loan and Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Loan and Security Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Loan and Security Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Loan and Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit G - Loan and Security Agreement, #8 Exhibit H - Loan and Security Agreement, #9 Exhibit I - Title Related Documents, #10 Exhibit J - Continuing Guaranty Document, #11 Exhibit K - Transfer Acknowledgement, #12 Exhibit L - BMO Transportation Finance Notice of Default Respecting Guaranty, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Harris Bank N.A. v. Pat Remington Trucking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Remington Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Remington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Harris Bank N.A.
Represented By: Jason A. Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?