Brown v. Google, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Defendant: Google Payment Corp. and Google, LLC
Case Number: 8:2020cv01311
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Filing 17 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google Payment Corp., Google, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Alphabet Inc., Corporate Parent XXVI Holdings Inc. for Google Payment Corp., Google, LLC.. (Stillman, Catherine)
December 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cerutti on behalf of Google Payment Corp., Google, LLC (Cerutti, Christina)
December 17, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Yunie Stillman on behalf of Google Payment Corp., Google, LLC (Stillman, Catherine)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Dargan Ware is hereby admitted as counsel for Plaintiff Michael Brown Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/4/2020. (dpk)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Wesley Barnett is hereby admitted as counsel for Plaintiff Michael Brown. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/4/2020. (dpk)
December 3, 2020 Filing 12 Supplemental Admission documents re: #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lesser, Leonard)
December 3, 2020 Filing 11 Supplemental Admission documents re: #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Lesser, Leonard)
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 Supplemental Admission documents re: #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Lesser, Leonard)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 Supplemental Admission documents re: #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Lesser, Leonard)
November 12, 2020 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY Notice of filing deficiency as to Dargan M. Ware filed 11/12/2020 has been deleted as it was intended for case number 20-CV-1320 and filed in this case in error (tad, )
November 9, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Dargan M. Ware. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Declaration of Sponsor, Petition for Admission to Practice form published by the Court 12/2019 and a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
November 9, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wesley W. Barnett. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a Declaration of Sponsor, the Petition for Admission to Practice form published by the court 12/2019 and a Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Dargan M. Ware, Esq. Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5308531. filed by Michael Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Dargan M. Ware Declaration with COGS, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s) ECF Registration) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Lesser, Leonard)
November 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Wesley W. Barnett Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5308510. filed by Michael Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Welsey W. Barnett Declaration and COG, #2 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit(s) ECF Registration) Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Lesser, Leonard)
October 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Google Payment Corp.)(kmc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Michael Brown is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint (Lesser, Leonard)
October 26, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Michael Brown is requesting summons(es) be issued as to #1 Complaint (Lesser, Leonard)
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In Person Rule 16 Conference set for 1/22/2021 at 9:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/15/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmc)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Dargan Ware, John Norris, Wesley Barnett, and Frank Davis. Address is 2154 Highland Ave, Birmingham, Alabama 35205. Phone number is 205-930-9900. Admissions due by 11/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Attorney Admission Requirement for John Norris, #2 Notice of Attorney Admission Requirement for Wesley Barnett, #3 Notice of Attorney Admission Requirement for Frank Davis) [Copies served upon attorneys via regular mail on 10/23/2020](kmc)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 STATEWIDE CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Google, LLC and Google Payment Corp. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5290114) filed by Michael Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Google, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Payment Corp.
Represented By: Christina Cerutti
Represented By: Catherine Yunie Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Represented By: Christina Cerutti
Represented By: Catherine Yunie Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Represented By: Leonard F. Lesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?