Langevin v. Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company
Plaintiff: Debra Langevin
Defendant: Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company
Case Number: 8:2020cv01412
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The Court held a Rule 16 Initial Conference with the parties on December 16, 2020. The Court, sua sponte, exempts this matter from the Mandatory Mediation Program. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/18/2020. (mab)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 3/31/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2021. Discovery due by 8/31/2021. Motions to be filed by 10/29/2021. Status Report due by 3/19/2021. This case has been exempt from the Court's Mandatory Mediation Program. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/18/2020. (mab)
December 16, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Rule 16 Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/16/2020. Appearances: Scott Goldie, Esq. for Plaintiff; Elizabeth Lorell, Esq. for Defendant. The Court hears from the parties as to their positions in this matter and as to how they intend to proceed. Mandatory Mediation is discussed. Based upon the discussions with counsel, the case is OPTED OUT of the Court's Mandatory Mediation Program. Deadlines set. A Scheduling Order will be issued. (TIME: 9:32AM-9:46AM). (mab)
December 10, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company. (Lorell, Elizabeth)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference in this matter is RESCHEDULED as to TIME ONLY and is now set for December 16, 2020 at 9:30 AM before the undersigned and will be conducted by TELEPHONE. The Court will issue a separate notice setting forth the instructions to connect to the conference call. As directed by General Order #25, Dkt. No. #3 , counsel are to submit a proposed Civil Case Management Plan and exchange Mandatory Disclosures on or before December 9, 2020. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 12/8/2020. (mab)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company.(Lorell, Elizabeth)
November 17, 2020 ***Answer due date updated for Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company answer due 11/20/2020. (hmr)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/16/2020 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/9/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (hmr)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Lawrence County Supreme Court, case number EFCV-20-158351 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5316602) filed by Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice to State Court of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langevin v. Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercury Insurance Group/Mercury Casulty Company
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Lorell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Langevin
Represented By: Scott Goldie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?