Schwartz et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al
Petitioner: Theresa Schwartz and Gregory Schwartz
Respondent: Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO., Honeywell International, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Rockwell Automation, Inc., Raytheon Aircraft Co., CBS Corporation, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Raytheon CO., Viacom Inc., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, Union Carbide Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., A.W. Chesterton Company, Beech Aircraft Corp., Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Allen Bradley Company, Inc., The B.F. Goodrich Company, General Electric Company, General Dynamics Corp., Curtis-Wright Corporation, Boeing Co., ITT LLC, IMO Industries Inc., Aircraft Parts Corporation, Aerospace Products Intl, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goodyear AeroSpace and AlliedSignal, Inc.
Cross Defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, George Schwartz, Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp., Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc. and Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace
Case Number: 8:2020cv01507
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16, Initial Conference in this case, has been reset for 3/10/2021 @ 10:00 AM, by telephone. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/3/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) This Court conference will be conducted by telephone and the parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter Access code 9772719#, and use Security code 1234# to join the call. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/19/2021. (tab)
January 7, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Response to Motion due by 1/28/2021. Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/4/2021 filed by Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s)) (McHugh, Timothy)
December 24, 2020 Filing 65 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ITT LLC for Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc... (Bandlamudi, Raghu)
December 24, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Raghu N Bandlamudi on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc. (Bandlamudi, Raghu)
December 22, 2020 Filing 63 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/3/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Copies sent by regular email to counsel who have an admission requirement} (jmb)
December 21, 2020 Filing 62 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ITT LLC identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for ITT LLC.. (Elkins, Patrick)
December 21, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of ITT LLC (Elkins, Patrick)
December 18, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Austin David O'Malley on behalf of Boeing Co. (O'Malley, Austin)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe recused. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 12/14/2020. (jel, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: Christopher Gladd, Esq. for Plaintiffs', Telephone: (844)-230-7676, Email: cgladd@napolilaw.com; Austin David O'Malley, Esq. for Deft Boeing, Telephone: 212-364-2301, Email: aomalley@mgmlaw.com; Michael Alan Tanenbaum, Esq., for Deft CBS Corp. and General Electric Co., Telephone: 973-242-0002, Email: mtanenbau@tktrial.com; Joseph P. LaSala, Esq., Deft Rockwell Automation, Inc. Telephone: (212) 483-9490, Email: jlasala@mdmc-law.com; Raghu N Bandlamudi, Esq., Deft Goulds Pumps, Inc., Telephone: 212-701-4128, Email: rbandlamudi@cullenllp.com; Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins, Esq., Deft ITT LLC, Telephone: 212-309-6876, Email: patrick.elkins@morganlewis.com. Admissions due by 12/23/2020. {Copy sent to all counsel by email} (jmb) Modified on 12/9/2020 to update Atty Tanenbaum represents Defs. CPS Corp and General Electric, not Curtis-Wright Corp.(lmw).
December 9, 2020 Filing 57 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-08861. electronically transferred when case opened
November 30, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York. (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re: #53 Letter, filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO., #52 Letter filed by General Electric Company, #54 Letter filed by IMO Industries Inc.. Accordingly, given the parties' consent and the location of the bulk of the facts in the Northern District, the Court GRANTS Defendant Boeing Co.'s motion to transfer. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/30/2020) (kv) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 25, 2020 Filing 55 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Meggitt-USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Meggitt PLC, Other Affiliate Meggitt Holdings (USA), Inc., Other Affiliate Meggitt International Ltd., Other Affiliate Meggitt International Holdings Ltd. for Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc.. Document filed by Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc...(Lee, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from David J. Goodearl dated November 23, 2020 re: Defendant Boeing Request for Leave to File a Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by IMO Industries Inc...(Goodearl, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Lawrence G. Lee dated November 23, 2020 re: Goodyear Tire and Meggitt Aircraft Have No Opposition to The Boeing Company's Request to File a Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO...(Lee, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 52 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Dennis E. Vega dated November 23, 2020 re: Joining in Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, Boeing Co., Curtis-Wright Corporation, General Dynamics Corp., Goodrich Corporation(Individually), Goodrich Corporation(and as successor in interest to the Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of Abex, Inc. ), Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc, IMO Industries Inc., ITT LLC, Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, Raytheon Aircraft Co., Raytheon Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Gable Lee to RE-FILE Document #36 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Enrique Vega on behalf of CBS Corporation..(Vega, Dennis) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dennis Enrique Vega on behalf of General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 23, 2020 Filing 48 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY for General Electric Company. Document filed by General Electric Company..(Vega, Dennis) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Raghu Bandlamudi dated 11/20/2020 re: Defendant GOULDS PUMPS LLC's No Opposition to Defendant The Boeing Company's Request to file Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc...(Bandlamudi, Raghu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 46 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ITT, Inc. for Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc.. Document filed by Goulds Pumps, Inc...(Bandlamudi, Raghu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Raghu N Bandlamudi on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Inc...(Bandlamudi, Raghu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Timothy J. McHugh dated November 20, 2020 re: Defendant Goodrich Corporation's No Opposition to Defendant The Boeing Company's Request to File Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by Goodrich Corporation(Individually)..(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Attorney Ezra H. Alter dated 11.20.20 re: Defendant Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation No Objection to Defendant The Boeing Company's Request to Transfer Venue. Document filed by Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation..(Alter, Ezra) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 20, 2020 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Attorney Patrick K.A. Elkins dated November 20, 2020 re: Defendant ITT LLC's No Opposition to Defendant The Boeing Company's Request to File Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by ITT LLC..(Elkins, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: #20 Letter filed by Boeing Co: On October 29, 2020, Defendant The Boeing Company submitted a letter requesting permission to file a motion to transfer venue. ECF No. 20. By November 24, 2020, all parties who have not already indicated on the docket their position on the motion to transfer venue shall file a letter setting forth their position. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/19/2020) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 18, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc...(Lee, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 17, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ezra H Alter on behalf of Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration).(Alter, Ezra) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIM.E TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between plaintiffs Gregory Schwartz and Theresa Schwartz and defendant Meggitt Aircraft Braking Systems Corporation, through their counsel, that defendant Meggitt Aircraft Braking Systems Corporation shall have until and including November 20, 2020, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc. answer due 11/20/2020. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/17/2020) (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 37 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc...(Lee, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 36 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - E 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Meggitt-USA, Inc. for Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc.. Document filed by Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc...(Lee, Lawrence) Modified on 11/23/2020 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Gable Lee on behalf of Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc...(Lee, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 16, 2020 Filing 34 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR (SEE #37) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO...(Lee, Lawrence) Modified on 11/16/2020 (kj). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: By November 16, 2020, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's letter of October 29, 2020, ECF No. 20. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/12/2020) (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for IMO Industries Inc.. Document filed by IMO Industries Inc...(Goodearl, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 10, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David James Goodearl on behalf of IMO Industries Inc...(Goodearl, David) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, Boeing Co., CBS Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, General Dynamics Corp., General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation(Individually), Goodrich Corporation(and as successor in interest to the Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary of Abex, Inc. ), Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Honeywell International, Inc, IMO Industries Inc., ITT LLC, Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by Raytheon Co., Raytheon Aircraft Co...(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 4, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Pratt & Whitney Aircraft. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Memo of Law, #2 Exhibit complaint, #3 Exhibit fact sheet).(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Nancy McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order)(if) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Kathleen Chetta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (if) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Timothy J. McHugh dated October 30, 2020 re: Pre-motion Letter Joining Co-Defendants The Boeing Companys Request to File Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by Pratt & Whitney Aircraft..(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #25 MOTION for Nancy McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22392630. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Nancy McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22392630. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Affirmation of Nancy McDonald, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Sponsoring Attorney, #4 Proposed Order).(LaSala, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 24 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Raytheon Technologies Corporation for Raytheon Aircraft Co., Raytheon Co.. Document filed by Raytheon Aircraft Co., Raytheon Co...(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 190135/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22390405).Document filed by Raytheon Co., Raytheon Aircraft Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint, #2 Exhibit initial fact sheet, #3 Exhibit state court document list).(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #22 MOTION for Kathleen Chetta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22390360. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Kathleen Chetta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22390360. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rockwell Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Sponsoring Attorney, #3 Affidavit Affirmation of Sponsoring Attorney, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(LaSala, Joseph) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 30, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Erik DiMarco dated 10/30/2020 re: Letter Joining Co-Defendant The Boeing Company's Request to File Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by General Dynamics Corp...(DiMarco, Erik) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Austin O'Malley dated 10/29/2020 re: Letter Requesting Permission to File Motion to Transfer Venue to NDNY. Document filed by Boeing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Fact Sheet).(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants. Document filed by General Dynamics Corp...(DiMarco, Erik) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation..(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of New York. Case Number: 190135/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22354164).Document filed by Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit complaint, #2 Exhibit initial fact sheet, #3 Exhibit state court list of documents, #4 Exhibit declaration, #5 Exhibit declaration).(McHugh, Timothy) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erik Christopher DiMarco on behalf of General Dynamics Corp...(DiMarco, Erik) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by General Dynamics Corp...(DiMarco, Erik) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of JOINDER OF REMOVAL AND INDEPENDENT NOTICE OF REMOVAL re: #1 Notice of Removal,. Document filed by General Dynamics Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(DiMarco, Erik) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. (Owner of Ten Percent Plus Stock) for Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO.. Document filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO...(Lee, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 27, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Gable Lee to RE-FILE Document #10 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ITT Inc., Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group for ITT LLC. Document filed by ITT LLC..(Elkins, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins on behalf of ITT LLC..(Elkins, Patrick) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO...(Lee, Lawrence) Modified on 10/27/2020 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Gable Lee on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO...(Lee, Lawrence) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Answer, Rule 7.1 Disclosure served on All Known Counsel of Record on 10/23/2020. Document filed by Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Austin David O'Malley. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: George Schwartz; CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation; GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY; Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary; Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace; Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp.; Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp.; Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted; alias party type was entered incorrectly; party name was entered incorrectly. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent ViacomCBS Inc. for CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation..(Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, Boeing Co., Curtis-Wright Corporation, General Dynamics Corp., Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace, Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp., IMO Industries Inc., Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation, Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp., Raytheon Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc., Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service).(Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Austin David O'Malley on behalf of Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint., CROSSCLAIM against A.W. Chesterton Company, Aerospace Products Intl, Aircraft Parts Corporation, CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Curtis-Wright Corporation, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, General Dynamics Corp., Goodrich Corporation f/k/a The B.F. Goodrich Company, individually and as successor in interest to The Cleveland Pneumatic Company, a division of the Pneumo Abex Corporation, a wholly owned subsidiary, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace, Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp., IMO Industries Inc., Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc., Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Parker Hannifin Corp., Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation, Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp., Raytheon Co., Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc., George Schwartz, Theresa Schwartz, Union Carbide Corporation. Document filed by Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Boeing Co...(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 190135/2020. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-22272123).Document filed by Boeing Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court).(O'Malley, Austin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 12/9/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz et al v. A.W. Chesterton Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Goodyear Tire & Rubber CO.
Represented By: Lawrence G Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rockwell Automation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raytheon Aircraft Co.
Represented By: Timothy J. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Dennis E. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Ezra H Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raytheon CO.
Represented By: Timothy J. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Viacom Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Dennis E. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pratt & Whitney Aircraft
Represented By: Timothy J. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Parker Hannifin Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Beech Aircraft Corp.
Represented By: Timothy J. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Meggit Aircraft Braking Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lawrence G Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Dennis E. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Allen Bradley Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The B.F. Goodrich Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: General Electric Company
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Dennis E. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: General Dynamics Corp.
Represented By: Erik C. DiMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Curtis-Wright Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Boeing Co.
Represented By: Austin David O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ITT LLC
Represented By: Patrick Kenneth-Allen Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: David J. Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aircraft Parts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Aerospace Products Intl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Raghu N Bandlamudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Goodyear AeroSpace
Represented By: Lawrence G Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AlliedSignal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CBS Corporation f/k/a Viacom, Inc., successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: George Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Raytheon Aircraft Co. f/k/a Beech Aircraft Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Rockwell Automation, Inc., f/k/a Allen Bradley Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Honeywell international, Inc., f/k/a Alliedsignal, Inc., and as successor in interest to the Bendix Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Pratt & Whitney Aircraft, a division of United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Timothy J. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Goodearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co., a/k/a Goodyear Aerospace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theresa Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?