Dame v. Li et al
Plaintiff: Mark Dame
Defendant: Si Hang Lai and San Lins Li
Case Number: 8:2021cv00224
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 2 Days (Non-Jury Trial). Preferred Trial Location: Albany, NY. Joinder of Parties due by 6/15/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2021. Discovery due by 11/15/2021. Motions to be filed by 3/1/2022. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/1/2021. Status Report due by 8/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/2/2021. (tab)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 4/29/2021. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 7/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 4/1/2021. (tab)
April 1, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/1/2021 by telephone. Appearances by Joseph Mucia, Esq. for plaintiff; Justin Meyer, Esq. for Defendants. Pretrial deadlines are established and a scheduling order will be issued. (tab)
March 24, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Si Hang Lai, San Lins Li. (Meyer, Justin)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Defendants by Mark Dame.(Mucia, Joseph)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 COURT NOTICE of dial-in instructions for Chambers Teleconference: This case is scheduled for it's Initial Conference on 4/1/2021 @ 9:00 AM. This Court conference will be conducted by telephone and the parties are directed to dial in at 1-888-684-8852, enter Access code 9772719#, and use Security code 1234# to join the call. (tab)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Notice of Removal, Notice and Verified Answer and Counterclaim served on Joe Mucia, Esq. on 03/03/2021, filed by Si Hang Lai, San Lins Li. (Meyer, Justin)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against Mark Dame by Si Hang Lai.(Meyer, Justin)
March 2, 2021 TEXT NOTICE to Attorney Justin Meyer, re: #4 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim. Pltf's counsel has been contacted to update his address. The Court attempted to contact him using the email in his account, but it was returned undeliverable. Since his address has not been updated yet, please conventionally serve the answer and file proof of service. (see)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 4/1/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/25/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
March 1, 2021 Clerk sent instructions to Attorney Joseph Mucia on how to update his address along with a copy of GO25. The email address in his account is not up to date and Clerk's email was returned undeliverable. A letter was mailed on 3/1/2021. (see)
March 1, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Si Hang Lai answer due 3/5/2021; San Lins Li answer due 3/5/2021. (see)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT with Exhibits relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (see)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York State Supreme Court, Clinton County, case number 2021-00000027 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5438101) filed by San Lins Li and Si Hang Lai. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dame v. Li et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Si Hang Lai
Represented By: Justin R. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Lins Li
Represented By: Justin R. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Dame
Represented By: Joseph R. Mucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?