Hunter v. Excellus Health Plan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert K Hunter
Defendant: Excellus Health Plan, Inc. doing business as Excellus Bluecross Blueshield
Case Number: 8:2021cv00744
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion from Excellus Health Plan, Inc. requesting Unopposed Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint : Excellus Health Plan, Inc. answer due 9/9/2021. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/5/2021. (tab)
August 4, 2021 Filing 20 Letter Motion from Excellus Health Plan, Inc. for Excellus Health Plan, Inc. requesting Unopposed Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint submitted to Judge The Honrable Mae A. D'Agostino . (Payton, Gwendolyn)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gwendolyn C. Payton, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 8/2/2021. (tab)
July 29, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gwendolyn C. Payton Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5601331. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Attorney Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission to Practice, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Whitmer, Frederick)
July 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick L. Whitmer on behalf of Excellus Health Plan, Inc. (Whitmer, Frederick)
July 27, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert K Hunter. Excellus Health Plan, Inc. served on 7/20/2021, answer due 8/10/2021. (Kassan, Randi)
July 20, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan P. McMillan on behalf of Robert K Hunter (McMillan, Ryan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur M. Stock on behalf of Robert K Hunter (Stock, Arthur)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan Matthew Lewis, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/9/2021. (tab)
July 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jordan Matthew Lewis Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5578359. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sponsor, #2 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kassan, Randi)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur M. Stock, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/6/2021. (tab)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan P. McMillan, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 7/6/2021. (tab)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Arthur M. Stock Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5574141. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kassan, Randi)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan P. McMillan Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5574048. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission, #2 Declaration Sponsor, #3 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Kassan, Randi)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement ; Attorney Ryan McMillan, Email address is rmcmillan@milberg.com. Phone number is (865) 247-0080. Admissions due by 7/14/2021. (Notice served upon attorney via e-mail)(gmd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement ; Attorney Jordan Lewis, Email address is jordan@jml-lawfirm.com. Phone number is (954) 616-8995. Admissions due by 7/14/2021. (Notice served upon attorney via e-mail)(gmd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement ; Attorney Arthur Stock, Email address is astock@milberg.com. Phone number is 865-247-0080. Admissions due by 7/14/2021. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail}(gmd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (gmd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 9/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/21/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Excellus Health Plan, Inc. (gmd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Excellus Health Plan, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5570731) filed by Robert K Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Member Contract, #2 Exhibit B-Initial Adverse Determination, #3 Exhibit C-Reconsideration Determination, #4 Exhibit D-Request for Appeal, #5 Exhibit E-Final Adverse Determination, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Excellus Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K Hunter
Represented By: Randi A. Kassan
Represented By: Arthur M. Stock
Represented By: Ryan P. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excellus Health Plan, Inc. doing business as Excellus Bluecross Blueshield
Represented By: Gwendolyn C. Payton
Represented By: Frederick L. Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?