Dame et al v. RL Vallee, Inc.
Plaintiff: Craig Dame and Sacred Corporation
Defendant: RL Vallee, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv01192
Filed: September 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Anne M Nardacci
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 11/30/2023. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 1/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/2/2023. (gmd)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 1/20/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 1/20/2024. Discovery due by 6/20/2024. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 3/22/2024. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 5/6/2024. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 5/21/2024. Motions to be filed by 9/20/2024. Anticipated length of trial: 5 Days. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/2/2023. (gmd)
November 1, 2023 Text Minute Entry for a Rule 16 Conference held on 11/1/2023 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The Court hears from counsel as to their positions, how they intend to proceed in this matter and the status of the case as it stood in Clinton County Supreme Court. Parties advise that defendants principal place of business is St. Albans, Vermont. Parties advise they anticipate filing a motion for repleading on the preliminary injunction decided in state court. The Court discusses the Mandatory Mediation Program with counsel. Counsel advises that related case R.L. Vallee, Inc. v. Subway Real Estate, Corp. et al., (8:23-cv-01202-AMN-DJS) is participating in mediation and would be central to any mediation or other resolution of this case. Scheduling Order deadlines set. A Uniform Pretrial Order will be issued. Plaintiffs advise the court they consent with the Motion to Consolidate. Counsel may contact the court if any issues arise after attempting to resolve them without intervention of court. Appearances: John M. Crotty, Esq., for plaintiff via telephone; Justin R. Meyer, Esq., for defendant, in person. Time: 10:02 AM - 10:29 AM.(gmd)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER re Dkt. #11 Letter Motion and #12 Letter Motion. Counsel may dial +1 518-217-2288, and enter ID code 210 721 570 to connect to the conference should they wish to appear via Telephone for the Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 11/1/2023 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/31/2023. (gmd)
October 31, 2023 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Justin R. Meyer, Esq. for RL Vallee, Inc. requesting Personal appearance submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Meyer, Justin)
October 31, 2023 Filing 11 Letter Motion from John Crotty for Craig Dame requesting Telephonic Appearance submitted to Judge Daniel J. Stewart . (Crotty, John)
October 25, 2023 Filing 10 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by RL Vallee, Inc.. (Meyer, Justin)
October 19, 2023 Filing 9 First MOTION to Consolidate Cases 8:23CV-01192-AMN-DJS and 8:23-CV-1202 filed by RL Vallee, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 11/9/2023 Motions referred to Daniel J. Stewart. (Meyer, Justin)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: An IN PERSON Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 11/1/2023 10:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/25/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/19/2023. (gmd)
October 17, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by RL Vallee, Inc..(Meyer, Justin)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set for 10/19/2023 and the 10/12/2023 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after an Answer has been filed. Counsel is directed to update the court with a Status Report due by 10/20/2023. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/13/2023. (gmd)
September 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE by RL Vallee, Inc. Exhibits to State Court Complaint (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Clerk)(Meyer, Justin)
September 21, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to RL Vallee, Inc. regarding the #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: The Exhibits listed in the State Court Complaint Exhibit A-F are missing from the filing of the Notice of Removal - Attorney Meyer needs to file the missing Exhibits A-F into this case using the Event - Other Filings - Notice - Notice Other and Call them - Exhibits to State Court Complaint - you can put them into on docket entry.Also the Dkt. No. #4 Civil Cover Sheet that was filed into this case is blank - please complete this document and file it in the same entry as the Exhibits - Labeling it Civil Cover Sheet - Clerk will them replace the blank one filed at Dkt. No. 4 with the completed document. Other Deficiency - The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/26/2023 (hmr)
September 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE by RL Vallee, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Meyer, Justin)
September 20, 2023 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to RL Vallee, Inc. regarding the #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. CIVIL COVER SHEET IS MISSING - Attorney Meyer will need to file this document into this case - using Civil Events - Other Filings - Notices - Notice -Other and then in the docket text you can change it to Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 9/25/2023 (hmr)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 10:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/12/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
September 18, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiffs in Clinton County Supreme Court. (hmr)
September 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Clinton County Supreme Court, case number 2023-00023483 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6448980) filed by RL Vallee, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Action Docket, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Action Decision and Order)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dame et al v. RL Vallee, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Dame
Represented By: John M. Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sacred Corporation
Represented By: John M. Crotty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RL Vallee, Inc.
Represented By: Justin R. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?