Grinnell et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: William Grinnell, Frank Sheldon and Daniel Blanchette
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency, New York State Department of Health and Town of Ticonderoga, New York
Case Number: 8:2023cv01265
Filed: October 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
3 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365 Clean Water Act - Citizen Suits re Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter Motion from Assistant Attorney General Abigail Katowitz for New York State Department of Health requesting Extension of time to respond to the complaint submitted to Judge David N. Hurd . (Katowitz, Abigail)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather E. Gange on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency (Gange, Heather)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abigail Katowitz on behalf of New York State Department of Health (Katowitz, Abigail)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert S. Rosborough, IV on behalf of Town of Ticonderoga, New York (Rosborough, Robert)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Grinnell, Frank Sheldon, Daniel Blanchette. Town of Ticonderoga, New York waiver sent on 10/19/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. (Hurst, William)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Defendant; Attorney Heather Gange, Email address is heathr.gange@usdoj.gov. Phone number is 202-514-4206. Admissions due by 11/27/2023. (khr)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Heather E. Gange on behalf of United States Environmental Protection Agency (Gange, Heather)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Grinnell, Frank Sheldon, Daniel Blanchette. New York State Department of Health waiver sent on 10/19/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. (Hurst, William)
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 conference set before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel for 1/10/2024 and the 1/3/2024 deadline for the submission of a joint Civil Case Management Plan and exchange of Mandatory Disclosures are ADJOURNED WITHOUT DATE. The hearing and related deadlines will be reset, if deemed necessary, after an Answer has been filed before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/19/2023. (gmd)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE PURSUANT TO G.O. 12 to Judge David N. Hurd and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart for all further proceedings Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe, Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Chief Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/16/2023. (jel, )
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying [] Direct Assignment. The cases are not related, and the Clerk is directed to randomly reassign the case. (jel, )
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Complaint: Attached a corrected Complaint to indicate the correct spelling of a named defendant. (khr)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/10/2024 09:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/3/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State Department of Health, Town of Ticonderoga, New York, United States Environmental Protection Agency. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to United States Attorney's Office, #2 Summons issued as to United States Attorney General)(khr)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 8:18-cv-442. (khr)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Daniel Blanchette, William Grinnell, Frank Sheldon regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. In the caption itself- Unites should be United. Please correct the spelling and file using case #8:23-cv-1265 and using the corrected document event. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 10/18/2023 (khr)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY as to Daniel Blanchette, William Grinnell, Frank Sheldon regarding the #1 Complaint, NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Counsel has checked off Jury Demand on the Civil Cover Sheet, but the Jury Demand is not noted in the Pleading, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 38. Failure to file a Demand for Jury Trial pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. Rule 38 constitutes a waiver of a jury trial. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 10/18/2023 (khr)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New York State Department of Health, Town of Ticonderoga, New York, United States Environmental Protection Agency (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6474096) filed by William Grinnell, Frank Sheldon, Daniel Blanchette. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grinnell et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grinnell
Represented By: William A. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Sheldon
Represented By: William A. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Blanchette
Represented By: William A. Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Heather E. Gange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Abigail Katowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Ticonderoga, New York
Represented By: Robert S. Rosborough, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?