Evans v. USA Bobsled and Skeleton Federation et al
Plaintiff: Aja Evans
Defendant: USA Bobsled and Skeleton Federation, United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee, Jonathan Wilhelm, Pro Chriopractic and Pro Chiropractic
Case Number: 8:2023cv01429
Filed: November 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Christian F Hummel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 29 Pre Motion Conference Letter Motion from David A. Bythewood for Pro Chiropractic requesting Pre Motion Conference submitted to Judge Mae A. D. D'Agostino . (Bythewood, David)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #24 Letter Motion to adjourn and reset the Initial Rule 16 Conference: The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/30/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The Initial Conference is reset for 2/6/2024 @ 11:00. The conference will be conducted by telephone. The Court will issue a separate notice setting forth the instructions to connect to the conference call in advance of the scheduled date and time. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/19/2023. (tab)
December 18, 2023 Filing 27 Pre-Motion Response filed by Aja Evans to #26 Pre-Motion Letter by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino . (Tuegel, Michelle)
December 13, 2023 Filing 26 Pre-Motion Letter by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee requesting a pre-motion conference submitted to Judge D'Agostino. MAD Pre-Motion Response Deadline 12/18/2023 (Barnhart, Lindsey)
December 12, 2023 Filing 25 Cross MOTION to Compel filed by Pro Chiropractic, Jonathan Wilhelm. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2024 (Attachments: #1 Affirmation, #2 Exhibit(s) A - state court docket sheet, #3 Exhibit(s) B - Wilhelm state court Notice of Discovery and Inspection, #4 Exhibit(s) C - Wilhelm state court Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars, #5 Exhibit(s) D - state court Pro Chiropractic Notice of Discovery and Inspection, #6 Exhibit(s) E - state court Pro Chiropractic Notice to Admit, #7 Exhibit(s) F -Stipulation requested and signed by the plaintiff setting a schedule to comply with Exhibits B and C, #8 Exhibit(s) G -Affidavit of actual knowledge by Donald Butzner, #9 Exhibit(s) H - Affidavit of actual knowledge by plaintiff's team mate Lolo Jones, #10 Proposed Order/Judgment, #11 Affidavit Affidavit of Service) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Bythewood, David)
December 7, 2023 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference filed by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee. Response to Motion due by 12/28/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Barnhart, Lindsey)
December 7, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsey Catherine Barnhart on behalf of United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee (Barnhart, Lindsey)
December 1, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Bythewood on behalf of Pro Chiropractic (Attachments: #1 Affirmation service)(Bythewood, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David A. Bythewood on behalf of Jonathan Wilhelm (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Service)(Bythewood, David)
December 1, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michelle Tuegel on behalf of Aja Evans (Tuegel, Michelle)
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lindsey Catherine Barnhart, Esq. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/29/2023. (tab)
November 28, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lindsey Catherine Barnhart Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6526574. [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Admission Petition, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Declaration of Sponsor, #3 Exhibit(s) C - EFiling Registration Form, #4 Exhibit(s) D - CA Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Dennis, Sara)
November 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE by Aja Evans re #5 Notice of Admission Requirement, Intent to remain as counsel (Betz, Edward)
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 Letter from David A. Bythewood re: #10 Notice of Admission Requirement (egr)
November 21, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee Statement Regarding Removal from State Court (Dennis, Sara)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on USA Bobsled and Skeleton on October 13, 2023, filed by Aja Evans. (Betz, Edward)
November 20, 2023 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #12 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #11 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal). Clerk modified the file date to reflect the date the answer was initially filed. (mmg)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Letter Request for an extension of time to answer/respond to complaint.: United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee answer due 12/13/2023. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/17/2023. (tab)
November 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Jonathan Wilhelm and Pro Chiropractic; Attorney David A. Bythewood,. Phone number is (516) 741-0066. Admissions due by 12/1/2023. Copy of admission letter and GO 25 sent Via postal mail.(mmg)
November 17, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for USA Bobsled and Skeleton Federation answer due 11/22/2023. (mmg)
November 17, 2023 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #1 Notice of Removal. Clerk has renamed exhibit #2 to have a better description of the exhibit. (mmg)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee (Dennis, Sara)
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 State Court Complaint filed by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee. Response to Motion due by 12/7/2023 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Christian F. Hummel. (Swears, Mary)
November 16, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (mmg)
November 16, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Aja Evans; Attorney Michelle Simpson Tuegel and Maryssa J. Simpson, Email address is michelle@stfirm.com and maryssa@stfirm.com. Phone number is (214)774-9121. Admissions due by 11/30/2023. Copy Sent Via Email alongside GO 25.(mmg)
November 16, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee; Attorney Lindsey Barnhart. Email address is lbarnhart@cov.com. Phone number is (650)632-4700. Admissions due by 11/30/2023. Copy sent Via Email along with GO 25(mmg)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/5/2024 09:30 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/29/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg, )
November 16, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee answer due 11/22/2023. (mmg)
November 15, 2023 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee. (mmg)
November 15, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal Filed by Plaintiff in Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Essex. (mmg)
November 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York County of Essex, case number cv23-0454 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6514609) filed by United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2. State Court Summons)(mmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. USA Bobsled and Skeleton Federation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aja Evans
Represented By: Edward A. Betz
Represented By: Michelle Tuegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Bobsled and Skeleton Federation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Olympic & Paralympic Committee
Represented By: Mary Swears
Represented By: Sara J. Dennis
Represented By: Lindsey Catherine Barnhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Wilhelm
Represented By: David A. Bythewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Chriopractic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Chiropractic
Represented By: David A. Bythewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?