Collazo v. Pagano et al
Case Number: |
9:2006cv00941 |
Filed: |
August 3, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
Presiding Judge: |
David R. Homer |
Presiding Judge: |
Norman A. Mordue |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 16, 2009 |
Filing
76
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, that 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge David R. Homer is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's 45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. ORDERED, that D efendants' 54 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and the action is DISMISSED in its entirety. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's 67 and 68 Letter Motions are DENIED. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's 73 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Norman A. Mordue on 9/16/09.(Memorandum-Decision and Order has been served on the Plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
July 16, 2009 |
Filing
64
REPORT-RECOMMENDATION AND ORDER: RECOMMENDED, that the 45 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Steven Collazo be DENIED in all respects. RECOMMENDED, that Defendants' 54 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment be GRANTED as to all defendants and all claims. Objections to R&R due by 7/30/2009 Case Review Deadline 8/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Homer on 7/16/09. (Report-Recommendation and Order served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
|
February 1, 2008 |
Filing
31
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. RECOMMENDED that 22 First MOTION to Dismiss the complaint conditionally and revoke plaintiff's IFP status filed by James Pagano, Gary Greene, Dr. Edmundo Nunez be GRANTED; RECOMMENDED that the order granting Collazo's IFP status (dkt no. 4) be VACATED; RECOMMENDED that the complaint be dismissed as to all defendants and all claims unless Collazo pays the filing fee of $250.00 within 30 days of the entry of a final order by the district court. RECOMMENDED that Collazo be BARRED from filing any IFP complaints in this district unless he is under imminent danger of serious physical injury.Objections to R&R due by 2/15/2008, Case Review Deadline 2/21/2008. Signed by Judge David R. Homer on 1/31/08. (nas)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?