Kotler v. Donelli et al
Case Number: 9:2006cv01308
Filed: October 27, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
Presiding Judge: Norman A. Mordue
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's # 266 motion for judgement as a matter of law or, in the alternative, for a new trial is DENIED. The Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's # 273 letter motion req uesting that his motion for judgment as a matter of law or, in the alternative, for a new trial be referred to a magistrate judge for a report and recommendation is DENIED as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. on 5/18/2017. [Copy served upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 JUDGMENT: in favor of Darwin Daily, David Charland, L. Jubert and W. Dann against Kerry Kotler. (Copy mailed to Pro Se party and therefore, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 6(d), an additional 3 (three) days for service may be allowed) (nmk)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 MEMORANDUM ORDER regarding 172 Motion in Limine, 175 Letter Request, 187 Motion in Limine, and, 188 Amended Motion in Limine: Motions are granted, denied, and deferred until trial as described herein. Signed by Judge Lyle E. Strom on 1/25/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, that the Report and Recommendation (Dkt. No. 118 ) is accepted. ORDERED, that all claims against John Donelli are dismissed. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 12/20/13. (served on non-ecf party by regular mail) (alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kotler v. Donelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?