Perry v. Ogdensburg Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: |
Howard Perry |
Defendant: |
Ogdensburg Correctional Facility, Carl Hunt, Upstate Medical University, Moustafa Hassan and Ogdensburg Correctional Facility, Medical Staff |
Case Number: |
9:2010cv01033 |
Filed: |
August 26, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
County: |
Queens |
Presiding Judge: |
Lawrence E. Kahn |
Presiding Judge: |
George H. Lowe |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 24, 2016 |
Filing
87
ORDER: ORDERED, that the Report-Recommendation (Dkt. No. 85 ) is APPROVED and ADOPTED in its entirety. ORDERED, that Defendant's Motion (Dkt. No. 77 ) for summary judgment is GRANTED in its entirety. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Cro ss-Motion (Dkt. No. 80 ) for summary judgment is DENIED. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 32 ) is DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 5/24/16. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
|
July 13, 2015 |
Filing
70
ORDER: ORDERED, that the Report-Recommendation (Dkt. No. 68 ) is APPROVED and ADOPTED in its entirety. ORDERED, that Plaintiff is permitted to pursue the cause(s) of action alleged in his Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 32 ). ORDERED, that this matter be returned to Magistrate Judge Dancks to reset pretrial deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 7/13/15. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
|
December 20, 2013 |
Filing
49
ORDER: ORDERED that 48 Report and Recommendation is approved and adopted in its entirety. ORDERED that 44 Motion to dismiss is denied. ORDERED, that this mattered is REFERRED to Judge Dancks for the holding of an evidentiary hearing regarding the exhaustion of administrative remedies. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 12/20/13. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
26
DECISION and ORDER: ORDERED that 24 Report and Recommendation is approved and adopted in its entirety. ORDERED that 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice to renew after Defendant complies with the Judge Dancks's discovery Order (Dkt. No. 24). Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 9/18/12. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?