Marino v. Watts et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Michael Marino
Defendant: Harrell Watts, Deborah G. Schult, Robert Helms, Jason Poirier, D. Ryan, Sepanek, Lucas, Joseph Smith and John and Jane Does 1-20
Case Number: 9:2012cv00801
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Norman A. Mordue
Presiding Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the order of the Honorable Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue, dated the 30th day of March, 2018. (served on plaintiff by regular and certified mail) (alh, )
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 153 ) is GRANTED. ORDERED, that the Defendants shall reply to Plaintiffs Requests for Admission ## 1, 2, 3, 14, 16, & 17, on or before February 9, 2018. ORDERED, that Plaintiff is granted leave to submit, in connection with the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, a supplemental Rule 7.1 Reply Statement of Material Fact, and a supplemental brief not to exceed five pages, on or before February 23,2018. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion for a Default Judgment for Failure to Timely Respond to the Requests for Admission (Dkt. No. 154 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/31/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants' Counsel to file a motion under FED. R. CIV. P. 25(a) to substitute the estate of Defendant Helms (Dkt. No. 116 ) is DENIED in light of Plaintiff's stated intent to discon tinue all claims against Defendant Helms, and Plaintiff is further directed to file a written request for discontinuance against Defendant Helms with the Court within fifteen (15) days of receipt of the filing date of this Order. ORDERED, that Plain tiff's Motions to Compel (Dkt. Nos. 119 & 120 ) are GRANTED TO THE LIMITED EXTENT that the Defendants' Counsel shall provide to the Court chambers the personnel files of Defendants Schult; Lucas; and Sepoanek, for an in camera review by the Court, and such production shall occur by July 14, 2017, and the Motions to Compel are IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS DENIED. ORDERED, that discovery in this matter, except as specifically noted above, is closed. ORDERED, that dispositive Motions in this case shall be filed by August 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 6/19/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion (Dkt. No. 95 ) is denied. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion (Dkt. No. 101 ) is denied. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion (Dkt. No. 104 ) is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 4/4/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 98 ) is denied without prejudice to re-filing if necessary. ORDERED, that Defendants' Letter-Motion (Dkt. No. 99 ) is granted and the demands set forth in Plaintiff's Motion shall be deemed as a properly served request for production of documents pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 34. Defendants shall respond to such demands in accordance with the time-frame set forth in Rule 34 as if the Plaintiff's demands had been served on the same date as this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 2/15/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDERED that defendants motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 69) be DENIED to the extent it seeks to dismiss plaintiffs retaliation claims for failure to state a claim and GRANTED as to defendant Watts; Defendant Watts is terminated as a defendant in this action. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 9/29/16. (jlm)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, the Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 56 ) is accepted in part and rejected in part as set forth herein. ORDERED that plaintiff's amended complaint (Dkt. No. 52 ) is accepted as set forth herei n. ORDERED that defendants Poirier, Ryan, and Smith are dismissed from this action. ORDERED that plaintiff's letter motion (Dkt. No. 59 ) is denied as moot as set forth herein. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 9/23/15. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, that the Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 47 ) is accepted insofar as it summarizes the facts and procedural background of this case, and otherwise rejected. ORDERED that defendants motion to dismi ss (Dkt. No. 34 ) is granted as set forth herein. ORDERED that the complaint is dismissed with leave to replead in accordance with this Memorandum-Decision and Order. ORDERED that if plaintiff does not submit a timely amended complaint, the matt er will be reviewed by this Court for judgment dismissing the action. ORDERED that if plaintiff does submit a timely amended complaint, the case shall be returned to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. ORDERED that ANY AMENDED COMPLAINT SHALL BE FILED AND SERVED ON OR BEFORE JUNE 6, 2014. ORDERED that PLAINTIFF IS WARNED THAT IF HE FAILS TO FILE AND SERVE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IN COMPLIANCE WITH THIS MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER ON OR BEFORE JUNE 6, 2014, THE CASE WILL BE DISMISSED. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 5/6/14. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marino v. Watts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Michael Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrell Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah G. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Helms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Poirier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sepanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?