Hudson v. Heath et al
Plaintiff: |
Calvin Hudson |
Defendant: |
Wayne Heath and Joy Albright |
Case Number: |
9:2012cv01655 |
Filed: |
November 7, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
County: |
Greene |
Presiding Judge: |
Mae A. D'Agostino |
Presiding Judge: |
Therese Wiley Dancks |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 15, 2016 |
Filing
61
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERS that 59 Magistrate Judge Dancks' March 25, 2016 Report-Recommendation and order is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons stated therein. ORDERS that 58 Defendants' motion for sanctions is GRANTED. ORDERS that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in Defendants favor and close this case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/15/16.{order served via regular mail and via certified mail on plaintiff} (nas)
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER: ORDERS that 38 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons stated therein. ORDERS that 28 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERS that Defendant Heath i s DISMISSED from this action. ORDERS that Defendant's motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Albright. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 8/29/14. {order served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
|
September 3, 2013 |
Filing
22
ORDER: ORDERS that Magistrate Judge Dancks' July 31, 2013 20 Report- Recommendation and Order is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons stated therein; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint (Dkt . No. 12 ) is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claims are DISMISSED with leave to amend; and the Court further ORDERS that Plaintiff's Fourth Amendment and official capacity claims are DISMISSED wit hout leave to amend; and the Court further ORDERS that, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with any claims that the Court has dismissed with leave to amend, he shall file an amended complaint, as directed below, within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of t his Order; and the Court further ORDERS that, if Plaintiff fails to submit an amended complaint within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Order, judgment will be entered in Defendants' favor, without further Order of this Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/3/2013. (ptm) (Copy served on plaintiff by regular mail)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?