Brandon v. Schroyer et al
Plaintiff: Chamma K. Brandon
Defendant: Glen Schroyer, Kinter, Larry Bedard, Web, Alger, Wingler, Perry, Margaret Clansy and Kevin Laurin
Case Number: 9:2013cv00939
Filed: August 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Seneca
Presiding Judge: David E. Peebles
Presiding Judge: Thomas J. McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion in limine (Dkt. No. 208 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part to the extent set forth in this opinion. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 7/19/2021. (nmk)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Decision and Order of the Honorable Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy, dated the 23rd day of March, 2017. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons discussed herein, the Court accepts and adopts Magistrate Judge Peebles's July 13, 2016 Report and Recommendation, Dkt. No. 136 . Accordingly, defendant Schroyer's second motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 100 ) is GRANTED, and plaintiff's remaining retaliation claim asserted against defendant Schroyer is DISMISSED. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 3/21/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, that the Plaintiff's objections to the Report-Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Peebles, dkt. # 111 , are hereby OVERRULED. The Report-Recommendation, dkt. # 99 , is hereby ADOPTED. ORDERED, that defendant Schroye r's motion for summary judgment, dkt. # 75 , is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is denied with respect to Plaintiff's retaliation claims against Plaintiff and GRANTED in all other respects. ORDERED, that defendant Sch royer's second motion for summary judgment is hereby accepted as filed. The Clerk of Court shall refer the motion to Magistrate Judge Peebles for a Report and Recommendation. ORDERED, that the motion of summary judgment of Defendants Bedard, Blaise, Clancy, Laurin, Kinter, Perry, Web and Wingler, dkt. # 77 , is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's failure-to-protect claim against Defendants Blaise and Clancy and GRANTED in all other respects. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 4/25/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon v. Schroyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chamma K. Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Schroyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Bedard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Web
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Clansy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Laurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?