Allah v. Rosati et al
Plaintiff: Kha'Sun Creator Allah
Defendant: John Rosati, E. LaPan, T. LaFountain and J. Vandenburgh
Case Number: 9:2014cv00788
Filed: June 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Presiding Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum directing the Superintendent of the above-named facility where KHA'SUN CREATOR ALLAH (DIN# 99-A-2660), is currently housed, or his deputies, to deliver sa id plaintiff to the Courthouse on the date and time specified above until the completion of this proceding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 1/25/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail; Auburn C.F. and Great Meadow C.F. have been served via email by CRD)(alh, )
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: ORDERED, Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum be issued to the Superintendent of Upstate Correctional Facility, or his deputies, for KHA'SUN CREATOR ALLAH (DIN# 99-A-2660), the plaintiff in the above-entitled action, who is in their res pective custody and charge, to be produced at 10:00 a.m. on Thursday, January 26, 2017 and each day thereafter for the duration of the Court proceeding, at the United States Courthouse at 445 Broadway, Courtroom No. 3, Albany, New York, for the purpo se of attending, and participating Mediation Session relative to the above-entitled case before the Honorable Christian F. Hummel. It appears that the plaintiff is presently incarcerated at Upstate Correctional Facility, and it is necessary that a W rit of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum be issued for the purpose of securing the presence of the plaintiff at said proceeding. It is expected that this proceeding will last approximately I day. ORDERED that a certified copy of this Order and said Writ be served via email and "certified mail - return receipt requested" upon the Superintendent of the named institution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 12/30/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: On August 15, 2016, this Court appointed pro bono trial counsel for the Plaintiff. Dkt. No. 38. Shortly thereafter, Plaintiff's trial counsel requested that the Court conduct an in camera review of the Defendant's personnel files, Dkt. No. 39, and Defendants' counsel agreed to this procedure. On October 18, 2016, the personnel files for Defendants Rosati, LaPan, LaFountain, and Vandenburgh were delivered to the Court, and subsequently reviewed. Having conducted the revie w, the Court rules on each personnel file as set forth herein. The Court directs the Defendant's counsel to immediately retrieve from the Court's courtroom deputy, Maria Blunt, the Rosati, LaPan, LaFountain, and Vandenburgh personnel files. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/4/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Participation of Inmate Kha'Sun Creator Allah (99-A-2660) is hereby ORDERED on Tuesday, June 28, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. for a telephone conference to be conducted by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The Court will initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 6/14/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail, CRD served order on facility)(alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allah v. Rosati et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kha'Sun Creator Allah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Rosati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. LaPan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. LaFountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vandenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?