McMillian v. Graham et al

Plaintiff: Herman Carlee McMillian
Defendant: H. Graham, Vince, 1-10 Correction Officer and Robert Thomas Johnson
Case Number: 9:2015cv00241
Filed: March 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
Presiding Judge: Randolph F. Treece
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 JUDGMENT entered pursuant to the Decision and Order and Order to Show Cause of the Honorable Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby, dated the 9th day of February, 2018. (served on plaintiff by regular and certified mail) (alh, )
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that defendants' motion to strike (Dkt. No. 120 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. Nos. 118 , 119 , and 121 ) are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/31/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. Nos. 109 , 110 , 112 , and 113 ) are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/6/17. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 92 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/13/16. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff)(alh, )
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that defendant's motion (Dkt. No. 78 ) for consolidation of the present case with McMillian II is GRANTED. ORDERED that this action be consolidated, for all purposes, with McMillian v. Ramsey ("McMillian II&qu ot;), No. 9:15-CV-1303, for all further proceedings. This present action shall be designated as the Lead Case, and McMillian II shall be designated as the Member Case. ALL FUTURE SUBMISSIONS SHALL NOW BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE ONLY. Except as ordere d herein below, there shall be no further filings in the Member Case. The Clerk is ordered to correct the dockets to reflect this consolidation. ORDERED that the Clerk shall reassign McMillian II to the undersigned as presiding District Judge and t o the Honorable Daniel J. Steward as presiding Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court place a copy of this Decision and Order in the file of McMillian II. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall make copies of the Complaint and t he Answer from McMillian II and shall docket them respectively as the Consolidated Complaint and the Consolidated Answer in this, the Lead Case. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall edit the docket in the Lead Case to include the following add itional defendants: (1) Correction Officer Ramsey and (2) Daniel Walters, also known as Correction Officer Walter, formerly known as Walter Doe. ORDERED that plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. Nos. 84 , 87 ) are DENIED. ORDERED that the Clerk shall refer this consolidated action to the assigned Magistrate Judge to reset the relevant pretrial deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/25/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 53 ) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/2/16. (served on plaintiff with dkt. nos. 2, 15, and docket report by regular mail) (alh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillian v. Graham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Carlee McMillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1-10 Correction Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Thomas Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?