Reeder v. Uhler et al
Plaintiff: |
Raszell Reeder |
Defendant: |
Superintendent Uhler, DSS Bell, Capt. Bishop, Capt. Zerniak, Sgt. Smith, Officer Reif, Officer Ramsdell, Lieutenant Quinn, Lieutenant Salls, Video Officer Drumm and Mental Health Worker Marinelli |
Case Number: |
9:2015cv01078 |
Filed: |
September 3, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
County: |
Franklin |
Presiding Judge: |
Mae A. D'Agostino |
Presiding Judge: |
Therese Wiley Dancks |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 8, 2019 |
Filing
193
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 173 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 180 Motion in Limine: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's motion in limine (Dkt. No. 173-1) is GRANTED in pa rt and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion in limine (Dkt. No. 180) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 8/8/2019. (Copy served via regular mail on plaintiff)(ban)
|
May 28, 2019 |
Filing
142
DECISION AND ORDER that Magistrate Judge Dancks' May 7, 2019 Order and Report-Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety for the reasons stated therein; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. [1 21]) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Deputy Superintendent Bell as a Defendant in this case. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 5/28/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal)
|
September 27, 2017 |
Filing
73
ORDER denying 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; adopting Report and Recommendations re 70 Report and Recommendations. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 9/27/2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(ban)
|
March 8, 2016 |
Filing
46
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 29 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to amend his complaint (Dkt. No. 29 ) is DENIED as unnecessary in light of the current amended pleading deadline. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/8/16. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
December 9, 2015 |
Filing
27
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's letter motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 21 ) is DENIED without prejudice for the reasons set forth above. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration (Dkt. No. 22 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 23 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 12/9/15. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?