Gee v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: Carl Gee
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci, Cheryl Morris, B. Crehan and M. R. Brown
Case Number: 9:2017cv00009
Filed: January 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Cayuga
Presiding Judge: Andrew T. Baxter
Presiding Judge: Mae A. D'Agostino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(A). Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/5/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 24 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/8/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment due process claim against defendant Lt. Brown survives the Court's initial review and requires a response. ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED wi thout prejudice for failure to state a claim in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1). ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate Annucci, Morris, and Creehan as defendants in this action. ORDERED that plaintiff is afforded thirty (30) days in which to submit either (i) a completed, signed, and duly certified in forma pauperis application and signed inmate authorization form; or (ii) a request for an order of this Court pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure dir ecting the U.S. Marshal to effect service on defendant Brown, together with payment of the $8.00 service and a copy of his complaint and a completed USM-285 form for the defendant, as set forth above. ORDERED that upon plaintiff's compli ance herewith the Clerk shall forward the file to the Court for consideration. ORDERED that in the event plaintiff does not seek in forma pauperis status or request service by the U.S. Marshal, the Clerk shall issue a summons and forward it to plai ntiff for service of process upon defendant Brown in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/7/17. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline 3/10/2017) (served on plaintiff by regular mail with blank forms)(alh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gee v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Crehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?