Gee v. Annucci et al
Plaintiff: |
Carl Gee |
Defendant: |
Anthony J. Annucci, Cheryl Morris, B. Crehan and M. R. Brown |
Case Number: |
9:2017cv00009 |
Filed: |
January 4, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
County: |
Cayuga |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew T. Baxter |
Presiding Judge: |
Mae A. D'Agostino |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 5, 2018 |
Filing
35
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISCONTINUANCE PURSUANT TO RULE 41(A). Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/5/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
|
February 8, 2018 |
Filing
30
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunctive relief (Dkt. No. 24 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/8/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail) (alh, )
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing
2
DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment due process claim against defendant Lt. Brown survives the Court's initial review and requires a response. ORDERED that plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED wi thout prejudice for failure to state a claim in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915A(b)(1). ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate Annucci, Morris, and Creehan as defendants in this action. ORDERED that plaintiff is afforded thirty (30) days in which to submit either (i) a completed, signed, and duly certified in forma pauperis application and signed inmate authorization form; or (ii) a request for an order of this Court pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure dir ecting the U.S. Marshal to effect service on defendant Brown, together with payment of the $8.00 service and a copy of his complaint and a completed USM-285 form for the defendant, as set forth above. ORDERED that upon plaintiff's compli ance herewith the Clerk shall forward the file to the Court for consideration. ORDERED that in the event plaintiff does not seek in forma pauperis status or request service by the U.S. Marshal, the Clerk shall issue a summons and forward it to plai ntiff for service of process upon defendant Brown in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/7/17. ( Notice of Compliance Deadline 3/10/2017) (served on plaintiff by regular mail with blank forms)(alh, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?