H'Shaka v. Bellnier et al
Plaintiff: |
Imhotep H'Shaka |
Defendant: |
Joseph Bellnier, Maureen Bosco, Deborah McCulloch, Joanne Waldron, Joseph Porcelli, Kevin Randall, David Lucia and Justin Delisle |
Case Number: |
9:2017cv00108 |
Filed: |
January 31, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Prisoner Office |
County: |
Clinton |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew T. Baxter |
Presiding Judge: |
Glenn T. Suddaby |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 22, 2021 |
Filing
119
TRIAL ORDER : A Jury Trial is set for 9/13/2021 at 9:00 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. Any request to the Court to issue a Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to produce an inmate witness to testify at trial must be made by 8/2/2021 and must include a detailed statement as to the relevancy of the inmate witness' testimony and what the inmate witness is expected to testify to. Pretrial Submissions are due by 8/16/2021, including any motions in limine and all respon ses to motions in limine must be filed on or before 8/23/2021. All counsel must appear in person at a final pretrial conference on 8/31/2021 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 4/22/2021. (sal)
|
March 12, 2020 |
Filing
102
DECISION AND ORDER that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 82 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part such that the following claims are DISMISSED: (a) Plaintiff's First Claim for unconstitutional conditions of confinement against the OMH Defendants; (b) Plaintiff's Second Claim for deliberate indifference to his serious medical needs against the DOCCS Defendants and the OMH Defendants; and (c) Plaintiff's Third Claim for violation of his right to substa ntive due process. SURVIVING these motions for summary judgment are the following claims: (a) Plaintiff's First Claim for unconstitutional conditions of confinement against Defendant O'Gorman, Defendant Porcelli, Defendant Randall, Def endant Lucia, Defendant Delisle, and Defendant Bellnier; and (b) Plaintiff's Fourth Claim for violation of his right to procedural due process against Defendant OGorman, Defendant Porcelli, Defendant Randall, Defendant Lucia, Defendant Del isle, and Defendant Bellnier. The Clerk is directed to contact counsel to schedule a settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to engage in meaningful settlement negotiations before the settlement c onference. In the event that counsel, after good faith negotiations, ultimately conclude that a settlement conference would not be productive, counsel may request to participate via telephone conference with Chief Judge Suddaby for a limited purpose of scheduling a trial date by electronically filing a letter request at least one week before the scheduled settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/12/2020. (sal )
|
February 9, 2018 |
Filing
41
DECISION AND ORDER denying # 17 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 2/9/18. (lmw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?