Baker v. Madison CO. DSS et al

Petitioner: Roderick I. Baker, Jr.
Respondent: Chittenango PD. and Madison Co. DSS
Case Number: 9:2018cv00820
Filed: July 12, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Prisoner Office
County: Dutchess
0 Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
1 Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 7/12/18. (served on petitioner with blank IFP form by regular mail)(alh, )
July 12, 2018 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-05964. electronically transferred when case opened
July 6, 2018 Mailed a copy of #3 Transfer Order N.D.N.Y. (Petition) (case opening only) to Roderick I. Baker, Jr DIN No. 07-B-0571 Fishkill Correctional Facility 271 Matteawan Road P.O. Box 1245 Beacon, NY 12508. (mhe) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/12/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #3 Transfer Order N.D.N.Y. (Petition) (case opening only) to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/12/2018.]
July 5, 2018 3 Featured Case TRANSFER ORDER. Petitioner, currently incarcerated at Fishkill Correctional Facility, brings this pro se petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254 challenging the constitutionality of his 2007 conviction in New York Supreme Court, Madison County. Because Petitioner was convicted and sentenced in Madison County, which is located in the Northern District of New York, this action is transferred under Local Rule 83.3 to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore informa pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/5/2018) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/12/2018.]
July 5, 2018 2 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/12/2018.]
June 28, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/12/2018.]
June 28, 2018 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Roderick I. Baker, Jr. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Madison CO. DSS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roderick I. Baker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chittenango PD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Madison Co. DSS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?