Green v. Mohawk Correctional Facility et al

Plaintiff: Yolonzol Green
Defendant: Mohawk Correctional Facility, Subbarao Ramineni and Espisito
Case Number: 9:2018cv01091
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
0 Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
1 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Yolonzol Green.(rar )
November 5, 2018 10 Letter Motion for Yolonzol Green requesting ifp application and notice of change of address to Fishkill Correctional Facility. (nas, )
October 30, 2018 9 Letter from Green requesting IFP form. IFP form provided. (nas, )
October 23, 2018 Updated copy of docket sheet served on plaintiff. (nas, )
October 16, 2018 8 Letter from Green inquiring as to status. (nas, )
October 1, 2018 7 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that plaintiff must, within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (2) submit an IFP Application which has been completed and signed by him and which has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility. ORDERED that; in the event Plaintiff fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, this action will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court. ORDERED that, upon Plaintiff's compliance with this Decision and Order, the file shall be returned to the Court for further review. ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank IFP Application; and shall also send Plaintiff a second copy of this Decision and Order, which Plaintiff may provide to the inmate accounts office at his facility along with his request for certification of his completed and signed IFP Application (and/or certified copies of his inmate account statements). Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 10/1/18. {served as directed}(nas, )
September 20, 2018 6 Featured Case TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/20/18. (served on plaintiff by regular mail)(alh, )
September 19, 2018 5 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Yolonzol Green. (alh, )
September 19, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Yolonzol Green.(alh, )
September 14, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility and a signed Inmate Authorization Form. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/14/18. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
September 13, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Yolonzol Green. (nas, )
September 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Espisito, Mohawk Correctional Facility, Subbarao Ramineni filed by Yolonzol Green. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Mohawk Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohawk Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subbarao Ramineni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Espisito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolonzol Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?