Miller et al v. Annucci et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Miller and Kristerfer Passino
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci, Mark Kinderman, Naomi Freeman, Justin Thomas, Robert Gage, Jeff McCoy, Ann Marie Sullivan, Christoopher Kunkle, Nora L. Staring, Caitlyn Taylor, Christopher Kunkle, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Erica Hughes, Christine A. Pallas, Aaron Shupp, Jill Grant, Julia Weir, Megan Thomas, Deborah McCullogh and Andrea Kiss
Case Number: 9:2019cv00030
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 Submission in support of #6 Letter Motion for preliminary injunction by Miller. (nas, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 Letter Motion from Daniel Miller requesting to file the attached exhibits under seal to be considered in support of #6 motion for preliminary injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(nas, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from Miller dated 2/16/19. (nas, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 Letter Motion for Daniel Miller requesting to file the attached exhibits under seal filed by Anthony J. Annucci, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Naomi Freeman, Robert Gage, Jill Grant, Erica Hughes, Mark Kinderman, Andrea Kiss, Christopher Kunkle, Jeff McCoy, Deborah McCullogh, Christine A. Pallas, Aaron Shupp, Nora L. Staring, Ann Marie Sullivan, Caitlyn Taylor, Justin Thomas, Megan Thomas, Julia Weir. (Mitchell, Mark)
February 13, 2019 Filing 16 Submission in support of #6 Letter Motion for preliminary injunction by Daniel Miller. (nas)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff Daniel Miller has filed a motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. No. 6) and a motion to seal (Dkt. No. 14). The Clerk is directed to provide Plaintiff Passino with copies of these submissions together with an updated copy of the docket sheet for this action. Authorized by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 2/12/19. {served as directed}(nas, )
February 12, 2019 TEXT NOTICE RE: #14 Letter Motion for Daniel Miller requesting to file the attached exhibits under seal : Response to Motion due by 2/22/2019 {text notice served via regular mail on plaintiffs}(nas, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 Letter Motion from Daniel Miller requesting to file the attached exhibits under seal to be considered in support of #6 motion for preliminary injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 envelope)(nas, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 Submission in further support of #6 Letter Motion for preliminary injunction by Daniel Miller. (nas, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 12 Submission in further support of #6 Motion for preliminary injunction by Daniel Miller. (nas)
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 Medical Records filed by Anthony J. Annucci, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Naomi Freeman, Robert Gage, Jill Grant, Erica Hughes, Mark Kinderman, Andrea Kiss, Christopher Kunkle, Jeff McCoy, Deborah McCullogh, Christine A. Pallas, Aaron Shupp, Nora L. Staring, Ann Marie Sullivan, Caitlyn Taylor, Justin Thomas, Megan Thomas, Julia Weir. (Mitchell, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Letter Motion from Daniel Miller for Daniel Miller requesting to obtain documents from his state court action filed by Anthony J. Annucci, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Naomi Freeman, Robert Gage, Jill Grant, Erica Hughes, Mark Kinderman, Andrea Kiss, Christopher Kunkle, Jeff McCoy, Deborah McCullogh, Christine A. Pallas, Aaron Shupp, Nora L. Staring, Ann Marie Sullivan, Caitlyn Taylor, Justin Thomas, Megan Thomas, Julia Weir. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A. Decision and Order denying Plaintiff Miller's motion)(Mitchell, Mark)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A, a court must review any "complaint in a civil action in which a prisoner seeks redress from a governmental entity or officer or employee of a governmental entity" and must "identify cognizable claims or dismiss the complaint, or any portion of the complaint, if the complaint... is frivolous, malicious, or fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; or... seeks monetary relief from a defendant who is immune from such relief." 28 U.S.C. 1915A; see also Carr v. Dvorin, 171 F.3d 115, 116 (2d Cir. 1999) (per curiam) (noting that Section 1915A applies to all actions brought by prisoners against government officials even when plaintiff paid the filing fee). On January 8, 2019, Defendants removed this action from the Oneida County Supreme Court and paid the required filing fee. Because of such removal, no initial review of the Complaint was conducted pursuant to section 1915A. On January 11, 2019, Defendants' filed a letter motion seeking an initial screening of Plaintiffs' Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Dkt. No. #5 . Plaintiff Miller consents to the Court's review. Dkt No. #6 . Defendants' motion (Dkt. No. #5 ) is GRANTED. If and when Plaintiffs' Complaint survives initial screening under Section 1915A, appropriate summonses will be issued to Plaintiffs. Defendants' time to respond to the Complaint is STAYED pending the Court's review of the Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. Accordingly, Defendants' motion for an extension of time to answer (Dkt. No. #8 ) is DENIED as MOOT. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/4/2019. (Text Order mailed to plaintiff via regular mail.) (rar, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Mark G. Mitchell for Anthony J. Annucci, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Naomi Freeman, Robert Gage, Jill Grant, Erica Hughes, Mark Kinderman, Andrea Kiss, Christopher Kunkle, Jeff McCoy, Deborah McCullogh, Christine A. Pallas, Aaron Shupp, Nora L. Staring, Ann Marie Sullivan, Caitlyn Taylor, Justin Thomas, Megan Thomas, Julia Weir requesting extension of time until March 8, 2019 to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Mitchell, Mark)
January 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUBMISSION BY PLAINTIFF MILLER in further support of his motion for a TRO and objection to the removal from State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Affidavit of Service, #3 envelope) (rar, ) Modified on 2/12/2019 (nas, ).
January 28, 2019 Change of Address for Daniel Miller. Old Address: Marcy Correctional Facility; New Address: Groveland Correctional Facility pursuant to Docket #6 . (rar, )
January 28, 2019 TEXT NOTICE RE: #6 Letter Motion from Daniel Miller for preliminary injunction. Response to Motion due by 2/8/2019.(Text Notice mailed to plaintiff via regular mail). (rar, )
January 25, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Daniel Miller for preliminary injunction. (rar, ) Modified on 1/28/2019 (rar, ).
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Mark G. Mitchell for Anthony J. Annucci, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Naomi Freeman, Robert Gage, Jill Grant, Erica Hughes, Mark Kinderman, Andrea Kiss, Christopher Kunkle, Jeff McCoy, Deborah McCullogh, Christine A. Pallas, Aaron Shupp, Nora L. Staring, Ann Marie Sullivan, Caitlyn Taylor, Justin Thomas, Megan Thomas, Julia Weir requesting initial screening of Plaintiffs Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) and 1915A submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Attachments: #1 copies of unreported decisions)(Mitchell, Mark)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anthony J. Annucci, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Naomi Freeman, Robert Gage, Jill Grant, Erica Hughes, Mark Kinderman, Andrea Kiss, Christopher Kunkle, Jeff McCoy, Deborah McCullogh, Christine A. Pallas, Aaron Shupp, Nora L. Staring, Ann Marie Sullivan, Caitlyn Taylor, Justin Thomas, Megan Thomas, Julia Weir (Mitchell, Mark)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: This action was removed to the District Court on 1/8/19. Defendants' response to the complaint is due by February 8, 2019. Authorized by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 1/9/19. {text order served via regular mail on plaintiffs}(nas, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal. (nas, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oneida County Supreme Court, case number CA2018-002967 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4611629) filed by Megan Thomas, Robert Gage, Christine A. Pallas, Caitlyn Taylor, Nora L. Staring, Aaron Shupp, Deborah McCullogh, Andrea Kiss, Mark Kinderman, Julia Weir, Anthony J. Annucci, Naomi Freeman, Bud C. Ballinger, III, Jane Burdick, Jill Grant, Ann Marie Sullivan, Jeff McCoy, Erica Hughes, Christopher Kunkle, Justin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 exhibit a - summons and verified complaint, #2 exhibit b - ex party order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. Annucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kinderman
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Freeman
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Thomas
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gage
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McCoy
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Sullivan
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christoopher Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nora L. Staring
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlyn Taylor
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kunkle
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bud C. Ballinger, III
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Burdick
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Hughes
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine A. Pallas
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Shupp
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Grant
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Weir
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Thomas
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah McCullogh
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Kiss
Represented By: Mark G. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristerfer Passino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?