Mancini et al v. Schenectady County Jail

Plaintiff: Reverend Keith Leslie Cyril Mancini, Joshua Santiago and Shannon Nisby
Defendant: Schenectady County Jail
Case Number: 9:2019cv00039
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David E Peebles
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff Mancini's requests set forth in the February Letter (Dkt. No. #6 ) are DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiff Mancini's IFP application (Dkt. No. #7 ) is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that plaintiff Mancini must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Decision and Order, (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (2) submit a completed, signed, and certified IFP application, or (3) submit a completed and signed IFP application along with certified copies of his inmate account for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of his complaint. ORDERED that in the event plaintiff Mancini fails to timely comply with the filing fee requirements set forth in this Decision and Order, he will be terminated as a party to this action and any claims asserted by him will be dismissed without prejudice without further Order of this Court. ORDERED that upon plaintiff Mancini's compliance with this Decision and Order, the file shall be returned to the Court for further review. ORDERED that the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on plaintiffs and include a blank IFP application to plaintiff Mancini. The Clerk shall also serve on plaintiffs any unreported cases cited to in this Decision and Order. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 3/4/19. (Attachments: #1 DOCCS directive, #2 case law) {served as directed}(nas, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Keith Leslie Cyril Mancini. (nas)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keith Leslie Cyril Mancini.(nas, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Keith Leslie Cyril Mancini requesting Court assistance. (nas, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Decision and Order sent to Shannon Nisby. Address sent to Schenectady County Jail. Envelope read "Return to Sender. Unclaimed. Unable to Forward." (rar, )
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiffs Mancini, Santiago, and Nisby must each individually, within 30 days of the date of this Decision and Order, either (a) pay the Court's filing fee of $400.00 in full or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application in accordance with this Decision and Order and a signed Inmate Authorization Form reflecting his individual consent to pay the $350.000 filing fee over time, in installments. ORDERED that if, within the time period specified above, Mancini, Santiago, or Nisby fail to comply with the terms of this Decision and Order delineated above, the non-compliant individual will be terminated from the docket and any claims asserted by that non-compliant individual will be dismissed from the action without prejudice without further Order of this Court. ORDERED that, upon full compliance with this Decision and Order, or at the expiration of time set to comply, whichever is earlier, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for further review. ORDERED the Clerk shall serve a copy of this Decision and Order on all of the purported plaintiffs. The Clerk shall also send Mancini, Santiago, and Nisby a blank complaint form, blank IFP application, and blank Inmate Authorization Form. The Clerk shall also serve on plaintiffs any unreported cases cited to in this Decision and Order. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 2/7/19. (Attachments: #1 case law cited, #2 case law cited, #3 case law cited, #4 case law cited, #5 case law cited)( Notice of Compliance Deadline 3/7/2019, Case Review Deadline 4/8/2019){orders and blank forms served on plaintiffs via regular mail}(nas)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Plaintiff, Mancini, submitted a letter advising of his change of address along with another copy of his complaint. (Attachments: #1 cover letter continuation, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 complaint resubmitted, #4 envelope #1, #5 envelope #2) (rar, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Change of Address by Keith Leslie Cyril Mancini Effective Date 12/29/18. Old Address: Schenectady County Jail; New Address: Downstate Correctional Facility. (Attachments: #1 envelope #1, #2 envelope #2, (rar, ) Modified on 2/5/2019 (rar, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Schenectady County Jail filed by Keith Mancini, Shannon Nisby, Joshua Santiago. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 cover letter, #3 envelope) (rar) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/14/2019) (rar, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancini et al v. Schenectady County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reverend Keith Leslie Cyril Mancini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Nisby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schenectady County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?