Dixon v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Dixon
Defendant: Officer John Doe and Correction Officer John Doe
Case Number: 9:2019cv00054
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
1 Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee for civil actions or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate official at his facility. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/16/19. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00173. electronically transferred when case opened
January 10, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Transfer Order N.D.N.Y. (Complaint)(case opening only), to Jerome Dixon DIN No: 17-R-1683 Gouverneur Correctional Facility 112 Scotch Settlement Road P.O. Box 370 Gouverneur, NY 13642-0370. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. Because Plaintiff is incarcerated at Gouverneur and the complaint relates to events that occurred primarily at Gouverneur in St. Lawrence County, this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. See 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/9/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Jerome Dixon.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against John Doe(Wyoming Correctional Facility), John Doe, John Doe(Gouverneur Correctional Facility), John Doe, John Doe, John Doe(Gowanda Correctional Facility). Document filed by Jerome Dixon. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Jerome Dixon.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officer John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?