Roy v. Alicia et al

Plaintiff: Lavar Roy
Defendant: Ann Marie Sullivan, MD, Dr. M. Beale, Michelle F. Hogan, MD, Anthony J. Annucci, Dr. Liu and Nurse Alicia
Case Number: 9:2019cv00585
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 BILL OF COSTS submitted by US Marshal re: Service Fees in the amount of $32.00. (nas, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Konstandinos D. Leris on behalf of Alicia, M. Beale, Liu, Ann Marie Sullivan, MD (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Leris, Konstandinos)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 299 Form) Executed as to M. Beale served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Acknowledgment filed by M. Beale. (Leris, Konstandinos) Modified on 7/10/2019 to reflect correct form (nas, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 299 Form) Executed as to Liu served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Acknowledgment filed by Liu. (Leris, Konstandinos) Modified on 7/10/2019 to reflect correct form (nas, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 299 Form) Executed as to Ann Marie Sullivan, MD served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Acknowledgment filed by Ann Marie Sullivan, MD. (Leris, Konstandinos) Modified on 7/10/2019 to reflect correct form (nas, ).
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE (USM 299 Form) Executed as to Alicia served on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Acknowledgment filed by Alicia. (Leris, Konstandinos) Modified on 7/10/2019 to reflect correct form (nas, ).
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Alicia, M. Beale, Liu, Ann Marie Sullivan, MD. {copy of summons; order and complaint served on the Office of the Attorney General}(nas, ) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/24/2019) (nas, ).
June 21, 2019 Provided Superintendent of Wende Correctional Facility with notice of the instant action and a copy of the inmate authorization form - copies of same provided to Financial Deputy, Syracuse. (nas, )
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED, that Plaintiff's IFP Application (Dkt. No. #7 ) is GRANTED. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's claims against each named defendant in his or her official capacity are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b). ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Fourteenth Amendment due process claims against Sullivan, Beale, Liu, and Alicia in their individual capacities SURVIVE sua sponte review and require a response. ORDERED, that all remaining claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ORDERED, that Annucci and Hogan are DISMISSED without prejudice as defendants. ORDERED, that Plaintiff's Motion for Counsel (Dkt. No. #4 ) is DENIED without prejudice and with leave to renew. ORDERED, that the Clerk shall issue summonses and forward them, along with copies of the complaint, to the United States Marshal for service upon defendants Sullivan, Beale, Liu, and Alicia. The Clerk shall forward a copy of the summons and complaint by mail to the Office of the New York State Attorney General, together with a copy of this Decision and Order. ORDERED, that the Clerk shall mail Plaintiff a copy of his Complaint (Dkt. No. 1). Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 6/21/19. {order and copy of complaint served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06062. electronically transferred when case opened
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that this action be transferred to the Northern District of New York. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 4/26/19. (mailed a copy of this order to plaintiff) (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lavar Roy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.] Modified on 5/16/2019 TO INCLUDE AUTHORIZATION FORM ATTACHED AT PAGE 6 (nas, ).
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT administratively terminating action. Signed by Clerk of Court on 2/27/19. (mailed a copy of this judgment to plaintiff Roy)(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he must notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order and must include either (1) a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of Plaintiffs inmate trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) and authorization form, or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and the $50.00 administrative fee ($400.00 total), the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/26/19. (mailed a copy of this order and a motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification)(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lavar Roy.(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT administratively terminating this action. Signed by Clerk of Court on 2/5/19. (mailed a copy of this judgment to plaintiff Roy)(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he must notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order and must include either (1) a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of Plaintiffs inmate trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) and authorization form, or (2) the $350.00 filing fee and the $50.00 administrative fee ($400.00 total), that upon Plaintiffs submission, the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/5/19. (mailed a copy of this order and form motion for IFP to plaintiff) (TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]
January 25, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice and timeline mailed to plaintiff (TF). [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lavar Roy.(TF) [Transferred from New York Western on 5/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. Alicia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Marie Sullivan, MD
Represented By: Konstandinos D. Leris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. M. Beale
Represented By: Konstandinos D. Leris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle F. Hogan, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Annucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Liu
Represented By: Konstandinos D. Leris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Alicia
Represented By: Konstandinos D. Leris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavar Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?