Gutierrez v. LaManna

Petitioner: Ramon Gutierrez
Respondent: Jamie Lamanna
Case Number: 9:2019cv00847
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04387. electronically transferred when case opened
July 10, 2019 Mailed a copy of #9 Order, to Ramon Gutierrez 09-A-3702 Green Haven Correctional Facility P.O. Box 4000 Stormville, NY 12582-4000. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
July 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner, docket the order in both actions, and note service on both dockets. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer these actions to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Petitioner should be permitted to proceed further without payment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. This order closes this case. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/9/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 19-1465. Petitioner moves for leave to file a successive 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED as unnecessary because Petitioner's proposed 2254 petition would not be successive. A 2254 petition is successive if a prior 2254 petition challenged the same criminal judgment, was decided on the merits, and reached final adjudication before the filing of the present motion. See Garcia v. Superintendent of Great Meadow Corr. Facility, 841 F.3d 581, 583 (2d Cir. 2016) (per curiam); Whab v. United States, 408 F.3d 116, 11819 (2d Cir. 2005). In Magwood v. Patterson, the Supreme Court held that "where... there is a new judgment intervening between the two habeas petitions,... an application challenging the resulting new judgment is not 'second or successive' at all." 561 U.S. 320, 34142 (2010) (internal citation omitted). Here, Petitioner challenges his custody pursuant to an amended judgment issued in May 2019, after the filing of his first 2254 petition. Accordingly, his proposed 2254 petition is not successive and he does not need this Court's authorization to file it in the district court. It is further ORDERED that both proceedings are TRANSFERRED to the district court. Whab, 408 F.3d at 119; see also 28 U.S.C. 1631 (permitting transfer of an action to an appropriate venue in the interest of justice"). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 07/01/2019. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Second or Successive Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus)(nd) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
June 20, 2019 Received returned mail re: #7 Order Striking Document from Record. Mail was addressed to Ramon Gutierrez 09-A-3702 Green Haven Correctional Facility P.O. Box 4000 Stormville, NY 12582-4000 and was returned for the following reason(s): Return to Sender - No Longer Here. Return to Sender, Refused, Unable to Forward. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Mailed a copy of #7 Order Striking Document from Record to Ramon Gutierrez 09-A-3702 Green Haven Correctional Facility P.O. Box 4000 Stormville, NY 12582-4000. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to strike document number 6 from this case, as it was erroneously filed in this action. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/29/2019) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 28, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 6 TRANSFER ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 28, 2019 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY & ENTERED IN WRONG CASE- Non-Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Non-Appeal Electronic Files for 6 Order, were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) Modified on 5/29/2019 (nd). [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Gregory H. Woods is no longer assigned to the case. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Mailed a copy of #5 Transfer Order U.S.C.A., to Ramon Gutierrez 09-A-3702 Green Haven Correctional Facility P.O. Box 4000 Stormville, NY 12582-4000. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Non-Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Non-Appeal Electronic Files for #5 Transfer Order U.S.C.A., were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. In the interest of justice, the petition is transferred to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. See 28 U.S.C. 1631; see also Liriano v. United States, 95 F.3d119, 122-23 (2d Cir. 1996) (per curiam). This order closes this case. If the Court of Appeals authorizes Petitioner to proceed in this matter, he shall move to reopen this case under this civil docket number. Because Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this as a "written opinion" within the meaning of Section 205(a)(5) of the E-Government Act of 2002. SO ORDERED. Sent original file along with documents numbered 1-5, certified copy of docket entries and transfer order. Mailed via Inter-Office Mail on 5/17/2019. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/17/2019) (ama) Transmission to Appeals Clerk. Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Ramon Gutierrez. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 465401235586)Document filed by Ramon Gutierrez.(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. LaManna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jamie Lamanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ramon Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?