White v. Bell
Petitioner: Equarn White
Respondent: Eric Bell and Earl Bell
Case Number: 9:2019cv01066
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Equarn White Effective Date 10/11/19 Old Address: Clinton Correctional Facility New Address: Fishkill Correctional Facility (nas, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Local Rule 72.4(e). ORDERED that the Respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that Petitioner may, but is not required to, file a reply within thirty (30) days of the filing date of Respondent's answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/12/19. (Attachments: #1 petititon; memo of law; exhibits)[response due by Earl Bell served on 9/12/2019, answer due 12/11/2019]{served as directed}(nas)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER: Based on petitioner's certified IFP Application, Dkt. No. #2 , he is eligible to proceed with this action without paying the statutory filing fee. His IFP Application is therefore GRANTED. Petitioner will still be required to pay fees that he may incur in the future regarding this action, including but not limited to copying fees ($.50 per page). Authorized by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/4/19. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Equarn White. (nas, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Equarn White. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 cover letter, #5 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Earl Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Equarn White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?