Blodywon v. McCoy et al
Plaintiff: Zhordrack Blodywon and Zhordrack Bloodywone
Defendant: Jeff McCoy, T. Miller and C. Roberts
Case Number: 9:2019cv01128
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Referring Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in U.S. District Court, Western District of New York as case 6:19-cv-06773, filed 10/18/2019. (nas, )
October 16, 2019 Case transferred electronically to the Western District of New York pursuant to order of transfer dated 10/16/2019. (meb)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Western New York: It is herebyORDERED, that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this Court shall transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk of this Court advise the Clerk of the Western District of New York of the entry of this Decision and Order and provide all information necessary for the Clerk ofthe Western District to electronically access the documents filed in this action. The Court hereby waives the fourteen (14) day waiting period provided for in Local Rule 83.6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/16/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Letter dated 9/28/2019 enclosing communication from his mother filed by Zhordrack Blodywon. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/25/2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(meb)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zhordrack Blodywon. (Attachments: #1 Mailing envelope) (meb)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete; and it is further ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action; and it is further ORDERED that, if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 9/12/2019. (Copy served via regular mail with blank forms)(meb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Zhordrack Blodywon. (rep)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Zhordrack Blodywon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (rep)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND: Against Jeff McCoy, T. Miller, and C. Roberts, filed by Zhordrack Blodywon. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 USM 285 (copy of), #3 Mailing Envelope)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blodywon v. McCoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhordrack Blodywon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhordrack Bloodywone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?