Curtis v. State of New York
Petitioner: Gary Curtis
Respondent: State of New York
Case Number: 9:2019cv01164
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Elaine Maerov on behalf of All Defendants (Maerov, Michelle)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the Clerk respectfully seal the attached exhibit, Dkt. No. 1-2, pursuant to N.D.N.Y.L.R. 8.1 given the identification of victims therein. Both parties are advised that any submission filed in this action must be redacted to exclude all information that tends to identify the victim in this case, or move to seal the documents. ORDERED that petitioner's IFP application (Dkt. No. #2 ) is DENIED. ORDERED that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Local Rule 72.4(e). ORDERED that the respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that petitioner may, but is not required to, file a reply within thirty (30) days of the filing date of respondent's answer.. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 10/8/19. (Attachments: #1 petition)[ response due by Paul Gonyea served on 10/8/2019, answer due 1/6/2020]{served as directed}(nas)
October 8, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY. Clerk has uploaded a redacted version of the Letter to Pro Se Rep. that complies with Local Rule 8.1 to the #1 petition. (rjb, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Cover Letter from Gary Curtis as to the $5.00 filing fee. (rep)
September 23, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 5.00, receipt number SYR055894. (rep)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Gary Curtis. (rep)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Gary Curtis. {Petitioner advises in cover letter that $5.00 is enclosed, however, no payment was included in mailing}. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter to the Court, #2 Letter to Pro Se Rep., #3 Mailing Envelope)(rep) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2019: #4 Redacted Letter to Pro Se Rep.) (rjb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis v. State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?