Chapman v. John Doe (One) et al
Plaintiff: Darrell Chapman and Darrell Bishop Chapman
Defendant: John Doe (One), John Doe (Two), Albany County Correctional Facility, United States Marshal Service and Jane Doe
Case Number: 9:2019cv01257
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Set Deadlines: Notice of Compliance Deadline from Albany Cty. Attorney re identify of Defendants - 1/2/2020. (sal)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DECISION AND ORDER that the following claims are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted: (1) Section 1983 claims against Albany County Correctional Facility and the USMS; and (2) Bivens claims against the USMS; and it is further ORDERED that the following claims are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted: (1) Fourteenth Amendment medical claims against John Doe #1, John Doe #2, and Jane Doe; and (2) FTCA claims against the USMS; and it is further ORDERED that Albany County C.F., the USMS, and Jane Doe are DISMISSED as defendants herein; and it is further ORDERED that the Fourteenth Amendment deliberate indifference claim, related to Plaintiff's safety, against John Doe #1 and John Doe #2 survive the Court's sua sponte review under 28 U.S.C. 1915A and require a response; and it is further ORDERED that the Office of the County Attorney for Albany County is hereby requested to produce the information specified above, to the extent that it can, regarding the identity of the defendants within thirty (30) days of the filing date of this Decision and Order. The information should be sent to the Clerk of the Court for the Northern District of New York along with a copy of this Decision and Order, as well as to Plaintiff at his address of record. Once this information is provided, the Clerk shall return this file to the Court for further review. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/3/2019. (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on October 25, 2019. (Copy served via regular mail)(rep)
October 25, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB011540. (rep)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application. In the event plaintiff chooses to file an IFP application, it must be accompanied by a signed inmate authorization form in accordance with the Court's Local Rules. Upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. In accordance with the Rule 10.1(c)(2) of the Court's Local Rules, plaintiff shall promptly notify the Clerk's Office and all parties or their counsel, in writing, of any change in his address. Plaintiff's failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application and blank inmate authorization form. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/15/2019. (Copy of Order, blank IFP and inmate authorization form served upon plaintiff via regular mail). (sal)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albany County Correctional Facility, Jane Doe, John Doe (One), John Doe (Two), United States Marshal Service filed by Darrell Chapman. (Mailing envelope included)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. John Doe (One) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Bishop Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (One)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (Two)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albany County Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?