Briglin v. Morley et al
Plaintiff: Todd R. Briglin
Defendant: RN Jane Doe, Corrections Officer "John Doe #2", New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Dr. Cahill, Darwin LaClair, Corrections Officer "John Doe #1", Sergeant "John Doe #3", V. Barber, John Morley, Dep. Walker, Dr. Hurley, Corrections Officer "G", Shawn Cronin, Dr. Pritti, Mary Tandy Walters and Stephen M. Ash
Case Number: 9:2020cv00614
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:19-cv-06927. electronically transferred when case opened
June 2, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against RN Jane Doe, Dr. Hurley, Dep. Walker, filed by Todd R. Briglin. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Exhibits, #3 Envelope) (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
May 28, 2020 Filing 17 Letter regarding an amended complaint filed by Todd R. Briglin. (Mailing envelope included) (meb)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Todd R. Briglin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q) (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 5/7/2020. All claims regarding direct transport from Franklin, the change in Plaintiffs medication and the denial of his rights under the ADA are severed and transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York; FURTHER, that all claims against New York State are dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate New York as a Defendant to this action; FURTHER, that as no claims against Franklin Defendants Morley, Ash, Waters, Cahill, Pritti, Barber and LaClair remain in this District, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate them as a Defendants to this action; FURTHER, that Plaintiffs remaining claims are dismissed, and that Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint as directed above by forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order. A copy of this Order a copy of the original Complaint, a blank 1983 complaint form, and the instructions for preparing an amended complaint; have been mailed to the Plaintiff at Franklin Correctional. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint as directed, the Court hereby certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 Authorization Form. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; finding as moot #10 Motion. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/28/2020. A copy of this order along with a blank Authorization form has been mailed to the Plaintiff at Franklin Correctional. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 Pro Se Plainitff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause, Preliminary Injunction, and Temporary Restraining Order. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Envelope) (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/21/2020. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No. 3) is again denied without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action, without filing the Complaint or assessing a filing fee. The Court will grant Plaintiff a final opportunity to fix his errors, and Plaintiff has untilFebruary 28, 2020 to either (1) submit a signed Authorization or (2) pay the full filing fee of $400.00. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this deadline, this case will be dismissed without prejudice. A copy of this order along with a blank Authorization form have been mailed to the Plaintiff at Franklin Correctional. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd R. Briglin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 Letter Request from Todd R. Briglin, dated 1/13/2020. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Letter Request from Todd Briglin, dated 1/6/2020. Per the Pro Se Department, it was not necessary to re-file a copy of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 1/8/2020. A copy of this judgment has been mailed to the Plaintiff at Franklin Correctional. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/7/2020. This action is administratively terminated, if Plaintiff wishes to reopen this case, he must notify the Court in writing within 30 days of the date of this Order and must include either (1) a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of Plaintiffs inmate trust fund account (or institutional equivalent) and authorization form, or (2) the $350.00 filingfee and the $50.00 administrative fee ($400.00 total). A copy of this order along with a blank form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation has been mailed to the Plaintiff at Franklin Correctional. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd R. Briglin.(SG) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 The Pro Se Packet including: the Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge and the Civil Case Timeline have been mailed to the Plaintiff. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd R. Briglin. (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Todd R. Briglin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Continuation of Exhibits, #3 Continuation of Exhibits, #4 Continuation of Exhibits) (BK) [Transferred from New York Western on 6/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briglin v. Morley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer "John Doe #2"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darwin LaClair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer "John Doe #1"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant "John Doe #3"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Officer "G"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pritti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Tandy Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen M. Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd R. Briglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?