Rivera v. Rich
Petitioner: Douglas Rivera
Respondent: John Rich
Case Number: 9:2020cv00865
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Cieprisz on behalf of John Rich (Cieprisz, Margaret)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Rivera requesting copy of docket sheet. Updated copy of docket sheet provided. (nas, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that the petitioner's motion for the Court to appoint him counsel, Dkt. No. #3 , is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED that the Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Local Rule 72.4(e). ORDERED that the respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that petitioner may, but is not required to, file a reply within thirty (30) days of the filing date of respondent's answer. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 petition)[ response due by John Rich served on 8/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020] {served as directed}(nas )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/7/2020. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas, )
August 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number utc003246 (nas, )
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement. Petitioner's IFP Application is DENIED as incomplete. Because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Upon petitioner's compliance with this order, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/5/2020. (Copy served upon Petitioner via regular mail). (sal)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Douglas Rivera.(nas, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Douglas Rivera.(nas, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Douglas Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 cover letter, #4 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Douglas Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?