Henderson v. United States Government
Plaintiff: Gabriel Henderson
Defendant: United States Government
Case Number: 9:2020cv00941
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Stewart
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to plaintiff's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and plaintiff was directed to respond to the Order if he wished to pursue this action. Plaintiff has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on September 28, 2020. (Copy served via regular mail)(rep)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM: Filed by Gabriel Henderson. (rep)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION: For Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Gabriel Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (rep)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. If plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full; or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP application. In the event plaintiff chooses to file an IFP application, it must be accompanied by a signed inmate authorization form in accordance with the Court's Local Rules. Upon plaintiff's compliance herewith, the Clerk shall reopen this action and forward it to the Court for review. In accordance with the Rule 10.1(c)(2) of the Court's Local Rules, plaintiff shall promptly notify the Clerk's Office and all parties or their counsel, in writing, of any change in his address. Plaintiff's failure to do so may result in the dismissal of this action. The Clerk serve a copy of this Order on plaintiff along with a blank IFP application and blank inmate authorization form. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/14/2020. (Copy served upon plaintiff together w/ blank IFP and inmate auth. form via regular mail) (sal )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against United States Government, filed by Gabriel Henderson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?