Shamsuddin v. Smith
Petitioner: Latif Shamsuddin
Respondent: Brandon J. Smith
Case Number: 9:2020cv00955
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret A. Cieprisz on behalf of Brandon J. Smith (Cieprisz, Margaret)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that 1. The Clerk serve copies of this Decision and Order and the petition upon respondent and the Attorney General of the State of New York in accordance with Local Rule 72.4(e); 2. The respondent shall file and serve an answer to the petition, and provide the Court with the relevant records, within ninety (90) days of the date of this Decision andOrder; 3. Petitioner's request to file a reply is GRANTED; 4. Petitioner may, but is not required to, file a reply within thirty (30) days of the filing date of respondent's answer. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 petition)[response due by Brandon J. Smith served on 9/8/2020, answer due 12/7/2020] {served as directed}(nas )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REOPENING CASE: This action was administratively closed due to petitioner's failure to comply with the filing fee requirements, and petitioner was directed to respond to the Order if s/he wished to pursue this action. Petitioner has now responded. The Clerk is directed to reopen this action and restore it to the Court's active docket. Authorized by Judge David N. Hurd on 9/3/2020. {text order served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas)
September 2, 2020 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number SYR058014 (nas, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Shamsuddin enclosing filing fee. (nas, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if petitioner wants to pursue this action, he must so notify the Court WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS of the filing date of this Order and either: (1) pay the court's filing fee of five dollars ($5.00); or (2) submit a completed and signed IFP Application that has been certified by an appropriate prison official at his facility. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/23/2020. {order and blank ifp form served via regular mail on petitioner}(nas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Latif Shamsuddin. (Attachments: #1 cover letter and request to file a memorandum of law, #2 copy of Court's letter of 7/17/2020, #3 envelope)(nas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamsuddin v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Latif Shamsuddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brandon J. Smith
Represented By: Margaret A. Cieprisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?