Basile v. Superintendent Mohawk C.F. et al
Plaintiff: Salvatore Basile
Defendant: Nurse Administrator, M.D. Mohammed Seedat and Superintendent Mohawk C.F.
Case Number: 9:2020cv00966
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christian F Hummel
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Salvatore Basile. (nas, )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND (2) submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 8/23/2020. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:20-cv-01077. electronically transferred when case opened
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER transferring the action to the Northern District of New York. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/19/20. (SG) Plaintiff mailed copy of order. [Transferred from New York Western on 8/21/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Salvatore Basile. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/21/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Salvatore Basile. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/21/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nurse Administrator, Mohammed Seedat, Superintendent Mohawk C.F., filed by Salvatore Basile. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/21/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (CGJ) [Transferred from New York Western on 8/21/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basile v. Superintendent Mohawk C.F. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvatore Basile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Mohammed Seedat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Mohawk C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?