Jackson v. Acevedo et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Jackson
Defendant: Lieutenant Jhon Cannars, C.O. P. Bailey, C.O. Jhon Acevedo, Dr. V. Monnava, A. Ferguson, Dr. Richard D'Amico, D. Venettozzi, Jamie M. Lamanna, C.O. Jhon Santos, A. Polizz, C.O. Jhon Santiago, C.O. R. Curry, Sergant Jhon Knight, Captain Jhon Bertone, Doctor Jhon Lee, Nurse Jane Doe and C.O. Jhon Brown
Case Number: 9:2020cv01092
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:20-cv-06655. electronically transferred when case opened
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Thomas Jackson, DIN No. 12A3039, at Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929, on 9/8/2020 Re: #9 Valentin Order via REGULAR MAIL. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (bwa) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
September 8, 2020 Mailed a copy of #9 Valentin Order, #2 Complaint, to New York State Attorney General at: 28 Liberty Street, New York, N.Y. 10005. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
September 4, 2020 PARTY TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY pertaining to Captain Bertone, Dr. Lee, Hearing Officer A. Polizzi, Superintendent Jamie LaManna, Lieutenant Connors, Dr. Mannova, Nurse Ferguson, Dr. Richard D'Amico, Southport Correctional Facility Nurse Jane Doe, New York State Department of Corrections abd Community Supervision (DOCCS) Director of the Special Housing D. Venettozzi only, from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Northern District of New York.(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #9 Valentin Order,,,,,, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing..(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PARTIAL TRANSFER ORDER & VALENTIN ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package.The Clerk of Court is further directed to sever the claims against Defendants Captain Bertone, Dr. Lee, Hearing Officer A. Polizzi, Superintendent Jamie LaManna, Lieutenant Connors, Dr. Monnova, Nurse Ferguson, Dr. Richard D'Amico, Southport Correctional Facility Nurse Jane Doe, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision (DOCCS) Director of Special Housing D. Venettozzi, and transfer the action involving those defendants, under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Finally, the Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order and the complaint to the Office of the New York State Attorney General at: 28 Liberty Street, New York, N.Y. 10005. An amended complaint form is attached to this order. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/04/2020) (ama) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Cathy Seibel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Mailed a copy of #7 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Warden/Superintendent of Clinton Correctional Facility at 1156 Rt. 374, P.O. Box 2000, Dannemora, NY 12929-2000; Thomas Jackson atnDIN No. 12A3039, Clinton Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Dannemora, NY 12929. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/21/2020) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION & A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. filed by Thomas Jackson..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY. Document filed by Thomas Jackson..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Thomas Jackson..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Document filed by Thomas Jackson..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Jhon Acevedo, P. Bailey, Jhon Bertone, Jhon Brown, Jhon Cannars, R. Curry, Richard D'Amico, Nurse Jane Doe, A. Ferguson, Jhon Knight, Jamie M. LaManna, Doctor Jhon Lee, V. Monnava, A. Polizz, Jhon Santiago, Jhon Santos, D. Venettozzi. Document filed by Thomas Jackson..(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Thomas Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(ks) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Acevedo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Jhon Cannars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. P. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jhon Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. V. Monnava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Venettozzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie M. Lamanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jhon Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Polizz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jhon Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. R. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergant Jhon Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Jhon Bertone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Jhon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Jhon Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?