Birchall v. N.Y.S. Police Inv. Fortuna et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Birchall
Defendant: Paul Gruner, Esq., N.Y.S. Police Inv. Fortuna, D. Holley Carnright, Majer Gold and Donald Williams
Case Number: 9:2020cv01263
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Administrative Closure with Opportunity to Comply with Filing Fee Requirement: ORDERED that plaintiff's IFP application is DENIED as incomplete. ORDERED that, because this action was not properly commenced, the Clerk is directed to administratively close this action. ORDERED that if plaintiff desires to pursue this action, he must, within 30 days of the filing date of this Order, (1) either (a) pay the $400.00 filing fee in full, or (b) submit a completed and signed IFP application; AND (2) submit a completed and signed inmate authorization form. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 10/14/2020. {order and blank forms served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas )
October 14, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-08250. electronically transferred when case opened
October 6, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of New York. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Mailed a copy of #4 Order, to Timothy Birchall, DIN No. 12-A-0098 at Shawangunk, 200 Quick Rd, Wallkill, NY 12589. (dsh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court. Transmitted re: #4 Transfer Order, to the Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/6/2020) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 5, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Timothy Birchall..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against D. Holley Carnright, Majer Gold, Paul Gruner, Esq, N.Y.S. Police Inv. Fortuna, Donald Williams. Document filed by Timothy Birchall..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Timothy Birchall..(rdz) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birchall v. N.Y.S. Police Inv. Fortuna et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Birchall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Gruner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.Y.S. Police Inv. Fortuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Holley Carnright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majer Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?